This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:57:51 (UTC).

ELECTRONIC FUNDS -V- GALLEGOS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 ELECTRONIC FUNDS -V- GALLEGOS was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3223

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC

Defendants

MARIO GALLEGOS

MARIO GALLEGOS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JACQUELINE N. ANKER

27 W. Anapamu St, # 325

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.

NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT MANDATORY LOCAL FORM CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT.; THANK YOU

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:32; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO PROOF OF SERVICE/NO APPEARANCE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:32; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FOR ORAP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180423-0251 $60.00; 180423-0251-CK Reference Number #5473

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180403-0098 $25.00; 180403-0098-CK Reference Number 52416

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • HEARING RE: JUDGMENT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: ILAYALI WADE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; RATHER THAN THE COURT REJECTING THE CCP 585 DECLARATION DUE TO EXCESSIVE AND UNSUPPORTED NOR; DOCUMENTED COSTS, AND IN EFFORT TO EXPEDITE PLAINTIFF(S)S DEFAULT AND MINIMIZE ADDITIONAL; COSTS AND DELAYS TO PLAINTIFF(S) AND THE COURT STAFF, AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE NOR DETRIMENT TO; THE DEFENDANT(S), THE COURT HAS REDUCED THE COSTS TO $660.00, THUS, THE OVERALL JUDGMENT HAS; BEEN PROPORTIONALLY REDUCED BY $ 185.00, FOR A TOTAL JUDGMENT OF $ 17,038.56; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 2/28/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/11/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/11/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 02/28/18; JUDGMENT FOR: ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIO GALLEGOS LLC, MARIO GALLEGOS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $13,538.74 INTEREST $1,639.82 ATTORNEY FEES $1,200.00 COSTS $660.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $17,038.56; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIO GALLEGOS LLC, MARIO GALLEGOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (MEDIUM) FILED 07/11/2017 OF ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC AS TO MARIO GALLEGOS LLC, MARIO GALLEGOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • ORDER PERMITTING SERVICE BY PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FOR STIP & ORDER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170925-0465 $20.00; 170925-0465-CK Reference Number 5254

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • ORDER & DEC ALLOWING SERVICE ON THE CORPORATE DEFENDANT BY SERVING CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF MISSING CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE SUBMIT MANDATORY LOCAL FORM CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT.; THANK YOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ELECTRONIC FUNDS SOURCE, LLC FOR FILING FE; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0573 $380.00; 170713-0573-CK Reference Number 5177

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less