Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/13/2018 at 20:18:47 (UTC).

ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR -N- LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA

Case Summary

On 03/10/2017 ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR -N- LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2035

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR

Respondent

LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SANDRA B. NORMAN

4192 Brocton Ave Suite 201

Riverside, CA 92501

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • HEARING RE: REVIEW OF JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 03/21/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/10/2017 OF ELEAZAR HIJAR FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/10/2017 OF ELEAZAR HIJAR ORDERED ENTERED 03/21/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING.(FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA FOR COPY MIN ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 03/10/2017 OF ELEAZAR HIJAR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; M J TORCHIA, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: PAULINE RODRIGUEZ; COURT REPORTER SOPHIA WISE 12008; BAILIFF: K SUTTON; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR PRESENT; RESPONDENT LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA PRESENT; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER ANTONIO VALENCIA # 301239 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR PETITIONER. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; CERTIFIED INTERPRETER SYSYA MADRIGAL # 301090 IS PRESENT TO INTERPRET SPANISH/ENGLISH FOR RESPONDENT. INTERPRETER'S JUDICIAL COUNCIL BADGE NUMBER HAS BEEN VALIDATED AND IDENTIFICATION HAS BEEN VERIFIED.; INTERPRETER OATH HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED AND PLACED ON FILE WITH THE COURT.; PROCEEDINGS:; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- BOTH PARTIES ARE/ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY BOTH PARTIES .; AFTER ARGUMENT,; THE COURT FINDS THAT THE STATUTORY AND JURISDICTIONAL RESIDENT REQUIREMENTS ARE MET.; THE COURT FINDS JURISDICTION WAS ACQUIRED BY LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA ON 10/12/16; BY FILING OF RESPONSE.; DECREE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE GRANTED ON GROUNDS OF IRRECONCILABLE DIFFERENCES; MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES UPON SIGNING OF JUDGMENT; ORDERS DATED 01/12/18 SHALL REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT AND SHALL BE INCORPORATED INTO THE MINUTES OF THIS DATE.; COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON THE FOLLOWING ITEMS; COMMUNITY PROPERTY IN MEXICO.; EACH PARTY IS AWARDED THEIR OWN PERSONAL PROPERTY THEY ARE ALSO RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR OWN DEBT.; COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION ON THE RETIREMENT PLAN TO BE DIVIDED EQUALLY BETWEEN THE PARTIES.; ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR IS ORDERED TO PAY AS AND FOR SPOUSAL SUPPORT THE SUM OF $400.00 PER MONTH, PAYABLE ONE-HALF ON THE 1ST AND ONE-HALF ON THE 15TH DAYS OF EACH MONTH, COMMENCING 03/01/18 AND CONTINUING UN; TIL THE DEATH OF EITHER PARTY, REMARRIAGE OF THE LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA OR:; COURT RECITED FC 4320 FACTOR TO THE PARTIES ON THE RECORD.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: REVIEW OF JUDGMENT SET FOR 05/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S50.; IF JUDGMENT IS SIGNED PRIOR TO THE NEXT COURT DATE HEARING MAY BE VACATED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION/POS BY MAIL ON 02/14/18 AS TO ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2017
  • FAMILY COURT SERVICES: APPOINTMENT 4/03/17 @ 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR, LAURA AMALIA CARRANZA IS DIRECTED TO REPORT TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FORTHWITH FOR ORIENTATION AND CHILD CUSTODY RECOMMENDING COUNSELING APPOINTMENTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • REFERRAL TO FAMILY COURT SERVICES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR RE: CC/CV (03/10/17).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ELEAZAR CAMEZ HIJAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170310-0590 $525.00; 170310-0590-DB Reference Number 030-0018878228

    Read MoreRead Less