This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 01:20:19 (UTC).

EDUARDO TAMAYO -V- AUTOTRANSPORTES TUFESA

Case Summary

On 11/29/2016 EDUARDO TAMAYO filed an Other lawsuit against AUTOTRANSPORTES TUFESA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0114

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EDGUARDO TAMAYO

MARIA SALOME SERRANO

EDUARDO TAMAYO

MARCOS SERRANO

YUBEL TAMAYO

DELFINA SERRANO

MARIA SERRANO SALAZAR

CARLOS SERRANO

Defendants

TUFESA U S A, LLC

AUTOTRANSPORTES TUFESA S A DE C V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAYFIELD & BARRETT, APC

9170 Irvine Center Dr Ste 100

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorney

FENNEMORE CRAIG PC

2394 E Camelback Road Ste 600

Phoenix, AZ 85016

 

Court Documents

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO EDGUARDO TAMAYO, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO EDGUARDO TAMAYO, WITH PREJUDICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SIGNED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED BY MAIL ON 05/06/18 AS TO DEFENDANTS, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SIGNED ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED BY MAIL ON 05/06/18 AS TO DEFENDANTS, FILED.

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY EDGUARDO TAMAYO

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY EDGUARDO TAMAYO

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO BE RELIEVED FILED BY YUBEL TAMAYO

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF MTN TO BE RELIEVED FILED BY YUBEL TAMAYO

MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 05/08/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUBEL TAMAYO (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL SET FOR HEARING ON 05/08/18, FILED BY PLAINTIFF YUBEL TAMAYO (IMAGED)

DECLARATION OF SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSE FILED

DECLARATION OF SUPPORT OF ATTORNEYS MTN TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSE FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BANAFSHEH,DANESH &JAVID APLC WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MARIA SALOME SERRANO.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING BANAFSHEH,DANESH &JAVID APLC WITH PRO/PER AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR MARIA SALOME SERRANO.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAYFIELD & BARRETT,APC WITH CHAHINE LAW APC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR YUBEL TAMAYO.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING LAYFIELD & BARRETT,APC WITH CHAHINE LAW APC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR YUBEL TAMAYO.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/20/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON 10/20/17 FILED.

NOTICE OF PLA COUNSEL BANKRUPTCY FILING FILED BY TUFESA U S A, LLC.

NOTICE OF PLA COUNSEL BANKRUPTCY FILING FILED BY TUFESA U S A, LLC.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/29/2016 OF EDUARDO TAMAYO AS TO EDUARDO TAMAYO ADDING ATTORNEY MAXIMUM LEGAL CALIFORNIA FILED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/29/2016 OF EDUARDO TAMAYO AS TO EDUARDO TAMAYO ADDING ATTORNEY MAXIMUM LEGAL CALIFORNIA FILED

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF A.NATHANIEL BORTZ AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED.

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF A.NATHANIEL BORTZ AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY TUFESA U S A, LLC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/28/16 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY TUFESA U S A, LLC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/28/16 FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161129-0404 $435.00; 161129-0404-CK Reference Number 88409

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT/TRIAL SETTING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER STEPHANIE AUSTIN 13119; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR EDUARDO TAMAYO.; ATTORNEY AARON LAVINE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR EDUARDO TAMAYO.; ATTORNEY TODD KARTCHNER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR AUTOTRANSPORTES TUFESA S A DE CV, TUFESA U S A, LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE.; REASON: TO ADDRESS ISSUES INVOLVED WITH THIS CASE.; HEARINGS:; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO EDGUARDO TAMAYO, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY YUBEL TAMAYO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO YUBEL TAMAYO, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0071253002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EDUARDO TAMAYO, YUBEL TAMAYO FOR FAX FILING FEES, POSTAGE, ENVELOPE, COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 180607-0440 $7.21; 180607-0440-VS Reference Number 033-0071253002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY TUFESA U S A, LLC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 12/28/16 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED AS TO TUFESA U S A, LLC. PARTY SERVED ON 12/28/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS NTC OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THIS IS AN ATTACHMENT TO THE POS-010, RESUBMIT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161129-0404 $435.00; 161129-0404-CK Reference Number 88409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.