This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 11:55:54 (UTC).

EDDIE SWAFFORD

Case Summary

On 01/26/2017 EDDIE SWAFFORD was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0030

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Not Classified By Court and Conservators

PUBLIC GUARDIAN OFTHE COUNTY OF

ROSE C ROSADO

Victorville, CA 92392

Conservatee

EDDIE SWAFFORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Conservator Attorneys

COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Ave 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

ROSADO, ROSE C

15476 W. Sand Street

Victorville, CA 92392

Petitioner and Conservatee Attorneys

ROSADO, ROSE C

15476 W. Sand Street

Victorville, CA 92392

HARTNELL LAW GROUP

25757 Redlands Blvd

Redlands, CA 92373

 

Court Documents

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

LETTERS OF TEMPORARY CONS OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE TO THE PG ISSUED

LETTERS OF TEMPORARY CONS OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE TO THE PG ISSUED

PETITION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY FOR PROPOSED CONSERVATEE FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(PROBATE).

PETITION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY FOR PROPOSED CONSERVATEE FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN(PROBATE).

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY ROSE ROSADO TO REPRESENT EDDIE SWAFFORD FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY ROSE ROSADO TO REPRESENT EDDIE SWAFFORD FILED.

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY PETIITON FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 01/26/2017 OF PUBLIC GUARDIAN OFTHE COUNTY OF

PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY PETIITON FOR CONSERVATORSHIP FILED 01/26/2017 OF PUBLIC GUARDIAN OFTHE COUNTY OF

NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

DECLARATION OF TRACHANNEL WILLIAMS-CATER FILED

DECLARATION OF TRACHANNEL WILLIAMS-CATER FILED

ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE TO THE PG BOND NOT REQUIRED FILED

ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY CONSERVATORSHIP OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE TO THE PG BOND NOT REQUIRED FILED

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO ETC FILED

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO ETC FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON RELIEVING RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • ACCOUNTING REVIEW BY; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PET. FOR ATTORNEY FEES BY MAIL ON 04/10/18 AS TO SEE LIST, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • ORDER ON PETITION FOR ATTYS FEES FOR COMPENSATION FOR SERVICES RENDERED TO CNSVTEE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FOR COMPENSATION FOR SERVICES RENDERED TO CONSERVATEE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JEANNE KENNEDY FOR ROSE ROSADO FOR EDDIE SWAFFORD.; DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL RAMONA VERDUZCO IS PRESENT FOR DEPUTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN CHANTEIL GUY, PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT GRANTS PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES FOR COMPENSATION FOR SERVICES RENDERED TO; CONSERVATEE.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; COURT ORDERS ACCOUNTING REVIEW RESET FROM JUNE 11, 2018 TO DECEMBER 10, 2018.; HEARINGS:; VACATE PRARV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/11/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; ACCOUNTING REVIEW SET FOR 12/10/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S35P.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION SUBSEQUENT PETITION BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • HRG OF 04/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • HRG OF 04/09/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF THE CONSERVATEES DEATH FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN OFTHE COUNTY OF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • CONFIDENTIAL CHANGE OF STATUS MEMO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTIFICATION TO COURT OF ADDRESS OF CONSERVATORSHIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON TEMP CONS OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PETITION FOR TO APPOINT ATTORNEY FOR PROPOSED CONSERVATEE (EX PARTE); Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ROSE ROSADO PRESENT FOR EDDIE SWAFFORD.; DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL RAMONA VERDUZCO IS PRESENT FOR DEPUTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN CHANTEIL GUY, TONYA HILL, TRACHANEL WILLIAMS-CATER.; ALL PRESENT IN COURTROOM.; MILTON SWAFFORD PRESENT IN PRO PER.; GERALD SWAFFORD PRESENT IN PRO PER.; CANDICE CARTER PRESENT IN PRO PER.; TRUDI MCQUEEN PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); COURT NOTES THAT ANY COMPETING PETITIONS FOR CONSERVATORSHIP ARE TO BE FILED AND SERVED BY; 4PM MARCH 27, 2017- IF THEY ARE FILED AFTER THAT DATE OR LATE, THEY WILL NOT BE CONSIDERED.; PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS TO BE GIVEN ACCESS TO THE BANK ACCOUNT THAT EDDIE SWAFFORD SHARES WITH TAMIKACO; URABE.; TRUDI MCQUEEN IS ORDERED TO TURN OVER TO THE PUBLIC GUARDIAN THE KEY THAT SHE HAS TO THE; PROPERTY: 14780 NEWCASTLE WAY, VICTORVILLE, CA 92394. COURT ORDERS THAT ONLY PUBLIC GUARDIAN; SHALL HAVE ACCESS TO THIS PROPERTY. PUBLIC GUARDIAN IS TO PROVIDE TO THE COURT ON THE DATE; OF THE NEXT HEARING THE INVENTORY OF THE ASSETS IN THE PROPERTY.; COURT ORDERS THAT TRUDI MCQUEEN IS TO FILE AND SERVE BY 4PM MARCH 6, 2017 TWO LISTS: ONE LIST; THAT CONTAINS THE ITEMS (WITH DETAILED DESCRIPTIONS) THAT SHE REMOVED FROM THE PROPERTY; IN VICTORVILLE, AND THE SECOND LIST IS THE LIST OF ITEMS (WITH DOCUMENTATION THAT THESE ITEMS; BELONG TO HER) THAT SHE IS REQUESTING TO RETRIEVE FROM THE PROPERTY IN VICTORVILLE.; HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 04/03/17 CONFIRMED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; CYNTHIA A LUDVIGSEN, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL RAMONA VERDUZCO IS PRESENT FOR DEPUTY PUBLIC GUARDIAN TONYA HILL.; TRACHANELL WILLIAMS-CATER PRESENT.; ATTORNEY ROSE ROSADO PRESENT FOR EDDIE SWAFFORD.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; ATTORNEY ROSE C ROSADO IS APPOINTED FOR EDDIE SWAFFORD. NEXT HEARING SET 01/27/17.; CLERK'S OFFICE TO PROVIDE APPOINTED COUNSEL WITH A COPY OF THE COURT FILE.; COURT NOTES THIS IS THE FIRST APPEARANCE FOR ATTORNEY ROSE ROSADO.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/27/17 AT 11:00 IN DEPARTMENT S36XP.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY PUBLIC GUARDIAN OFTHE COUNTY OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF TEMPORARY CONSERVATOR FILED BY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF CONSERVATOR OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (CONSERVATORSHIP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR PUBLIC GUARDIAN OFTHE COUNTY OF ARE WAIVED FOR PETN FOR CONS OF THE PERSON AND ESTATE IN THE AMOUNT OF $555.00.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.