This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 19:28:38 (UTC).

EDD -V- RON G STUKIS

Case Summary

On 05/02/2001 EDD filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against RON G STUKIS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7156

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2001

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME

Defendant

RON G STUKIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2006

DocketAction Text: FILING FEE PAID BY STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 061018-2168 $86.00; 061018-2168-CK Reference Number 018-668052

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2006

DocketAction Text: FILING FEE PAID BY STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 061018-2157 $7.00; 061018-2157-CK Reference Number 018-668052

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2006

DocketAction Text: FILING FEE PAID BY STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 061018-2160 $7.00; 061018-2160-CK Reference Number 018-668052

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2006

DocketAction Text: FILING FEE PAID BY STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 061018-2155 $7.00; 061018-2155-CK Reference Number 018-668052

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2005

DocketAction Text: WRIT RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2004

DocketAction Text: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( * )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2004

DocketAction Text: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2003

DocketAction Text: WRIT RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2003

DocketAction Text: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( * )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2003

DocketAction Text: MEMO OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/03/2001

DocketAction Text: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2001

DocketAction Text: PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2001

DocketAction Text: STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2001

DocketAction Text: COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON PETITION FILED 05/02/2001 OF STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME ORDERED ENTERED 05/02/01; JUDGMENT FOR: STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME; JUDGMENT AGAINST: RON G STUKIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1468.42 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,468.42; CASE DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less