This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/13/2020 at 22:55:16 (UTC).

EDD -V- JOSEPH W MICKLOW

Case Summary

On 06/10/1993 EDD filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against JOSEPH W MICKLOW. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4287

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/1993

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF CALIFORNIA - EDD

Defendant

JOSEPH W MICKLOW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE OF CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENTDEV DEPT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/13/2002

DocketAction Text: FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 020617-0306 $80.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2002

DocketAction Text: FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 020617-0303 $7.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2002

DocketAction Text: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULL SATISFIED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/01/2002

DocketAction Text: FILE RETURNED TO C.R.C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2002

DocketAction Text: FILE RECEIVED FROM CRC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2002

DocketAction Text: WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $25.00.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2001

DocketAction Text: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( * )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/09/2001

DocketAction Text: MEMO OF CSTS AFTER JDGMT, ACKNWLDGMT OF CREDIT, AND DECL OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/1993

DocketAction Text: STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/1993

DocketAction Text: COURT NOW RULES -- STAT CASE FOR 2C REPORT; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 06/10/1993 OF STATE OF CALIFORNIA- EDD ORDERED ENTERED 06/10/93; JUDGMENT FOR: STATE OF CALIFORNIA- EDD; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSEPH W MICKLOW; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $788.72 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $788.72

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/1993

DocketAction Text: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less