This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 21:19:48 (UTC).

EDD -V- JOHNNY L GREEN

Case Summary

On 04/12/2000 EDD filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against JOHNNY L GREEN. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic and Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6119

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2000

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME

Defendant

JOHNNY L GREEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTMENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/24/2008

DocketAction Text: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 2450.89 )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2008

DocketAction Text: COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,237.66

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/18/2008

DocketAction Text: DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $990.00 FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2000

DocketAction Text: WRIT RETURNED -- ( ORANGE COUNTY, DATED 4/13/00)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2000

DocketAction Text: STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ALL OTHER JUDGMENTS BEFORE TRIAL.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON PETITION FILED 04/12/2000 OF STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME ORDERED ENTERED 04/12/00; JUDGMENT FOR: STATE OF CA EMPLOYMENT DEVELOPMENT DEPARTME; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOHNNY L GREEN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2188.23 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,188.23; CASE DISPOSITIONED BY JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2000

DocketAction Text: WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY ( * )

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2000

DocketAction Text: ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2000

DocketAction Text: PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less