This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 12:48:33 (UTC).

DWAYNE JONES -N- AMINAH ABDUL-HAKIM

Case Summary

On 08/04/2017 DWAYNE JONES -N- AMINAH ABDUL-HAKIM was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2408

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Respondents

AMINAH ABDUL-HAKIM

DWAYNE JONES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY AND JUDGMENT RECEIVED BACK FROM USPS FOR AMINAH ABDUL-HAKIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/02/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT VCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/04/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 08/04/2017 OF DWAYNE JONES FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 08/04/2017 OF DWAYNE JONES ORDERED ENTERED 06/04/18; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 05/17/18 BY AMINAH ABDUL-HAKIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY DWAYNE JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF AMINAH ABDUL-HAKIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY AMINAH ABDUL-HAKIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY AMINAH ABDUL-HAKIM FOR PRELIMINARY, FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF DEC RE SVC,IE,FINAL DEC,SAD,POS BY MAIL ON 05/15/18 AS TO DWAYNE JONES, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DWAYNE JONES IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DWAYNE JONES FOR 1ST APP FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • SEPARATE PROPERTY DECLARATION FILED BY DWAYNE JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF DWAYNE JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DWAYNE JONES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.