This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 14:58:21 (UTC).

DURGIN VS MEADOW SQUARE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2017 DURGIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MEADOW SQUARE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0887

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRENDA LEE DURGIN

Defendant

MEADOW SQUARE APARTMENT

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 03/29/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:42; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: MARCIA HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF BRENDA LEE DURGIN PRESENT; MEADOW SQUARE APARTMENT REPRESENTED BY JAMIE REYNOLDS.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; AFTER MEDIATION, MATTER IS NOT SETTLED.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- BRENDA DURGIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COURT REFERENCES DOCUMENTS IN COURT FILE.; JAMIE REYNOLDS IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR DEFENDANT.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; TONI BAKER IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 02:20; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ****************************; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 01/31/2017 OF BRENDA DURGIN ORDERED ENTERED 03/27/17; JUDGMENT FOR: BRENDA LEE DURGIN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MEADOW SQUARE APARTMENT; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $180.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $180.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC-100 FILED AS TO MEADOW SQUARE APARTMENT. PARTY SERVED ON 02/24/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY BRENDA LEE DURGIN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY BRENDA LEE DURGIN IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON BRENDA LEE DURGIN FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $50.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.