This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:57:16 (UTC).

DT ONTARIO-V-SCOTT & FETZER

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 DT ONTARIO-V-SCOTT FETZER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3220

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC

Defendants

THE SCOTT & FETZERCOMPANY

JAMES P IORIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KNUTSON LAW, P.C.

Po Box 3658

Dana Point, CA 92629

DANA F KNUTSON DBAKNUTSON LAW

P O Box 3658 24681 La Plaza Ste 350

Dana Point, CA 92629

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (AFTER DEFAULT); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180213-0258 $25.00; 180213-0258-CK Reference Number 13378

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 42962.17 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180213-0255 $25.00; 180213-0255-CK Reference Number 13377

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF KNUTSON LAW, P.C. FOR DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC CHANGES ITS NAME TO DANA F KNUTSON DBAKNUTSON LAW FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/22/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JAMES P IORIO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $34,854.29 INTEREST $6,602.88 ATTORNEY FEES $960.00 COSTS $520.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $42,937.17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CALCULATION OF INTEREST FILED BY DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF FEES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; UNDERLYING STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT/ INVOICES FILED BY DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • WAIVER OF INTEREST IN EXCESS OF 10% PER ANNUM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO THE SCOTT & FETZERCOMPANY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DT ONTARIO HOTELS PARTNERS LESSEE LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170712-0312 $435.00; 170712-0312-CK Reference Number 12836

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 18 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 02/26/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $34,854.29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less