This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 11:40:23 (UTC).

DREW VS ARROW

Case Summary

On 08/03/2010 DREW filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARROW. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0779

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DREW CARRIAGE COMPANY INC.

Defendants

CARMEN ALANIZ

ARROW COLLISION CENTER INC

RANDY ALANIZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2011
  • WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF AT WINDOW ); Minutes; Receipt: 101012-3884 $25.00; 101012-3884-CK Reference Number 8196

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2010
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 09/10/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; JUDGE PRO TEM: TIMOTHY DAY PRESIDING; CLERK: TANYA PIRDY; BAILIFF: D DAUDEL; APPEARANCES:; DREW CARRIAGE COMPANY INC. REPRESENTED BY GREG PEREZ.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; 10:43; THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE; ARROW COLLISION CENTER INC, CARMEN ALANIZ, RANDY ALANIZ NOT HAVING APPEARED, THIS MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; GREG PEREZ IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; JUDGMENT:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST ARROW COLLISION CENTER INC, CARMEN ALANIZ, RANDY ALANIZ.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT DREW CARRIAGE COMPANY INC. HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ARROW COLLISION CENTER INC, CARMEN ALANIZ, RANDY ALANIZ:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,417.01 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $180.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,597.01; DOCUMENTS RETURNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DREW CARRIAGE COMPANY INC. FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: JUDGE PRO TEM FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO CARMEN ALANIZ. PARTY SERVED ON 08/17/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO RANDY ALANIZ. PARTY SERVED ON 08/17/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SS. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO ARROW COLLISION CENTER INC. PARTY SERVED ON 08/17/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $50.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100803-3198 $30.00; 100803-3198-CK Reference Number 8145

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.