This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 06:16:22 (UTC).

DORSAINVILLE V WOOD

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 DORSAINVILLE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WOOD. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1527

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EVELYNE BANKS DORSAINVILLE

Defendant

GEOFFREY WOOD

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2012
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 08/14/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; CHRISTOPHER B MARSHALL, JUDGE; CLERK: KATHLEEN SAENZ; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; 03:12; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF EVELYNE BANKS DORSAINVILLE PRESENT; DEFENDANT GEOFFREY WOOD PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SETTLEMENT.; THE PARTIES AGREED TO SETTLE FOR DEFENDANT PAYING PLAINTIFF $400.00 CASH (DONE IN OPEN COURT) AND; DEFENDANT IS TO CANCEL THE LIEN SALE ON PLAINTIFFS VEHICLE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO GEOFFREY WOOD. PARTY SERVED ON 05/17/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4380 $30.00; 110504-4380-VS Reference Number 07104B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/04/2011 OF EVELYNE DORSAINVILLE FOR GEOFFREY WOOD, ADD GERMAN AUTOHAUS.

    Read MoreRead Less