This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 02/25/2020 at 06:56:40 (UTC).

DOREEN HERRING, ET AL -V- CITY OF UPLAND, ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 DOREEN HERRING filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF UPLAND. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0885

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOREEN HERRING

DONNELL HERRING

DOREEN HERRING AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR

Defendants

GIOVANNI VILLARREAL

COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

RICHARD MADRID

ROQUE CAMPO

ALEJANDRO MARTINEZ

CITY OF UPLAND

ALEXANDER MONROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JUSTIN H. KING

3633 Inland Empire Blvd. Suite 250

Ontario, CA 91764

Defendant Attorneys

BRADLEY & GMELICH

700 N Brand Boulevard 10Th Floor

Glendale, CA 91203

DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL

385 North Arrowhead Avenue, 4Th Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92415-0140

CARPENTER ROTHANS & DUMONT

500 South Grand Avenue 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

GROSSBERG & HOEHN

1026 W Foothill Blvd

Upland, CA 91786

 

Court Documents

MINUTE ORDER RE COURTS RULING ON DEMURRER/MOTION FILED.

MINUTE ORDER RE COURTS RULING ON DEMURRER/MOTION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER FILED.

DEMURRER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; REPRESENTED BY DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; REPRESENTED BY DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; REPRESENTED BY DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; REPRESENTED BY DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; REPRESENTED BY DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL(IMAGED)

DEMURRER FILED BY COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; REPRESENTED BY DEPUTY COUNTY COUNSEL(IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 01/28/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT GIOVANNI VILLARREAL (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 01/28/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT GIOVANNI VILLARREAL (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 01/28/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT GIOVANNI VILLARREAL (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 01/28/19, FILED BY DEFENDANT GIOVANNI VILLARREAL (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: JOINDER IN DEFT CO OF SAN BDNO MTN CONT GFS SET FOR HEARING ON 03/04/20, FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF UPLAND, ALEXANDER MONROY, RICHARD MADRID (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: JOINDER IN DEFT CO OF SAN BDNO MTN CONT GFS SET FOR HEARING ON 03/04/20, FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF UPLAND, ALEXANDER MONROY, RICHARD MADRID (IMAGED)

ORDER THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

ORDER THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; LEAVE OF COURT GRANTED ON 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DOREEN HERRING FOR 30 DAYS TO FILE THIRD AMENDED.

NOTICE RE: PLAINTIFF NOT FILING AMENDED PLEADING FILED BY DOREEN HERRING, DONNELL HERRING, DOREEN HERRING AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR.

NOTICE RE: PLAINTIFF NOT FILING AMENDED PLEADING FILED BY DOREEN HERRING, DONNELL HERRING, DOREEN HERRING AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER TO THE SAC FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON DEMURRER TO THE SAC FILED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DOREEN HERRING

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DOREEN HERRING

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/28/19 FILED BY GIOVANNI VILLARREAL. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: DEMURRER SET FOR HEARING ON 01/28/19 FILED BY GIOVANNI VILLARREAL. (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 01/28/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOREEN HERRING, DONNELL HERRING, DOREEN HERRING AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: STRIKE SET FOR HEARING ON 01/28/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF DOREEN HERRING, DONNELL HERRING, DOREEN HERRING AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketJURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketREADINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMOTION RE: CONTESTING APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFENDANT COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMOTION RE: JOINDER IN DEFT CO OF SAN BDNO MTN CONTESTING APPL FOR GFS FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF UPLAND, ALEXANDER MONROY, RICHARD MADRID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketDEFT VILLARREALS RESPONSE TO COUNTY OF SBS MTN CONTESTING APP FOR GFS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION RE: JOINDER IN DEFT CO OF SAN BDNO MTN CONT GFS SET FOR HEARING ON 03/04/20, FILED BY DEFENDANT CITY OF UPLAND, ALEXANDER MONROY, RICHARD MADRID (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF JOINDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST BE RESERVED IN ADVANCE, PLEASE CALL CUST SVC LINE AT 909-708-8678 TO DO SO..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketPURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTION 6103.5 FEES FOR CITY OF UPLAND ARE WAIVED FOR MOTION FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ROQUE CAMPO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/17/18 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/17/18 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/13/2018 OF DOREEN HERRING, COUNTY OF SAN BERNARDINO, ALEXANDER MONROY, RICHARD MADRID, ALEJANDRO MARTINEZ, GIOVANNI VILLARREAL, ROQUE CAMPO IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/13/2018 OF DOREEN HERRING, DONNELL HERRING, DOREEN HERRING AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR IS ADDED AS A PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; ; Minutes; Receipt: 180813-0129 $435.00 ; 180813-0129-VS Reference Number #033-0081474889

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.