This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/20/2021 at 07:28:40 (UTC).

DONNA NICHOLSON -V- CALIFORNIA MENTOR

Case Summary

On 09/02/2015 DONNA NICHOLSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA MENTOR. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Frangie, Janet M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2743

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Not Yet Classified

Frangie, Janet M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONNA NICHOLSON

Defendants

CALIFORNIA MENTOR

CPES CALIFORNIA , INC.

DOE CORPORATIONS

HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC.

Not Yet Classified

CALIFORNIA MENTOR DBA COLE VOCATIONAL

COLE VOCATIONAL SERVICES

MUIR MOUNTAIN HOME

CONV

Other

TO THE ESTATE OF DECENDANT ARNOLD BROWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEYS- ABOGADOS

3024 Railroad Avenue

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER, LLP

One South Church Avenue Suite 700

Tucson, AZ 85701

SMITH LAW OFFICES,APC

4204 Riverwalk Parkway Suite 250

Riverside, CA 92505

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

07/10/2017: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DON

05/04/2017: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DON

MOTION RE- SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CPES CALIFORN

03/01/2017: MOTION RE- SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY CPES CALIFORN

DECLARATION OF STEVEN H HENDERSON IN SUPPORT OF MO

08/22/2016: DECLARATION OF STEVEN H HENDERSON IN SUPPORT OF MO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CPES CALIFORNIA , INC

08/04/2016: AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY CPES CALIFORNIA , INC

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER

01/28/2016: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS LEWIS ROCA ROTHGERBER

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON CPES C

11/24/2015: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP-PET ON CPES C

NOTICE IMAGED

09/02/2015: NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

09/02/2015: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

09/02/2015: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150902-246

09/02/2015: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150902-246

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: HEARING RE: OSC RE:SANCTION FTA DOUGLAS SMITH 061517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketHearing Re:; Original Type: Hearing Re:; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: HEARING RE: OSC RE:SANCTION FTA DOUGLAS SMITH 061517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Predisposition; Original Type: Order to Show Cause - Predisposition; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DispositionJudgment; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal; Comment; Comment: (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Filed; Comment: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketJury Trial; Original Type: Jury Trial; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Frangie, Janet M; Comment: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT) JANET M FRANGIE,JUDGE CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN - APPEARANCES: STEVEN HENDERSON APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR DONNA NICHOLSON. JEFFREY SKLAR APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR CPES CALIFORNIA , INC.. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF INFORMS THE COURT THAT HE HAS RECEIVED PAYMENT FROM THE DEFENDANT HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES BUT NO SIGNED AGREEMENT, HE HAS RECEIVED A SIGNED AGREEMENT FROM THE DEFENDANT CPES CALIFORNIA INC., BUT NO PAYMENT. - ATTORNEY SKLAR INFORMS THE COURT THAT HIS CLIENT CPES IS WAITING ON A FULLY EXECUTED AGREEMENT BEFORE RELEASING THEIR CHECK. HE HAS BEEN ATTEMPTING TO CONTACT HIS CLIENT TO LET THEM KNOW THAT HORRIGAN COLE HAS MADE THEIR PAYMENT. - DOUGLAS SMITH IS ORDERED TO APPEAR AND SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AND/OR FAILURE TO FILE REQUIRED DOCUMENTS. - IF A COMPLETED SIGNED AGREEMENT HAS BEEN RECEIVED BY HORRIGAN COLE THE SANCTION HEARING WILL BE REMOVED. - HEARINGS: CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29. HEARING RE:OSC RE:SANCTION FTA DOUGLAS SMITH 061517 SET FOR 07/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. === MINUTE ORDER END ===

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2015
  • DocketParty Added; Comment: ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DONNA NICHOLSON, HORRIGAN COLE ENTERPRISES, INC. IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20150902-2469; ConversionPayment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $2,241.00; Total Payments and Credits: $2,241.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed; Comment: DECLARATION OF DONNA NICHOLSON FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED 150902-2469-CK CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 150902-2469-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 28547

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases where California Mentor is a litigant

Latest cases where CPES CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Horrigan Cole Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant