This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:01:17 (UTC).

DONALD TUREK-V-LOMAS PRIVADAS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 DONALD TUREK-V-LOMAS PRIVADAS was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7754

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DONALD TUREK

Defendants

LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS AASOCIATION

DEANNA WILLIAMS

JENNIFER WESIBART-MORENO

FRANCES MCLEOD

PETER JIMENEZ

LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC

JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LESTER & CANTRELL , LLP

1770 Iowa Avenue Suite 110

Riverside, CA 92507

Defendant Attorney

HANGER, STEINBERG,SHAPIRO & ASH

21031 Ventura Blvd Suite 800

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6512

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DONALD TUREK.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY DONALD TUREK.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

ANSWER FILED BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC, DEANNA WILLIAMS, FRANCES MCLEOD, JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO, PETER JIMENEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HANGER, STEINBERG,SHAPIRO & ASH.

ANSWER FILED BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC, DEANNA WILLIAMS, FRANCES MCLEOD, JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO, PETER JIMENEZ; PARTY REPRESENTED BY HANGER, STEINBERG,SHAPIRO & ASH.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC, DEANNA WILLIAMS, FRANCES MCLEOD, JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO, PETER JIMENEZ

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC, DEANNA WILLIAMS, FRANCES MCLEOD, JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO, PETER JIMENEZ

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS/COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DEANNA WILLIAMS. PARTY SERVED ON 01/16/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS/COMPLAINT FILED AS TO DEANNA WILLIAMS. PARTY SERVED ON 01/16/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PETER JIMENEZ SERVED ON 01/16/18 WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO PETER JIMENEZ SERVED ON 01/16/18 WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT/NOTICE/ADR FILED AS TO JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO. PARTY SERVED ON 01/16/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT/NOTICE/ADR FILED AS TO JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO. PARTY SERVED ON 01/16/18. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUED SERVICE. WITH FEES OF $59.00.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DONALD TUREK - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DONALD TUREK - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DONALD TUREK

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED -- AMENDING 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF DONALD TUREK

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • MOTION RE: TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY MATTHEW J. KRAUS PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JUSTIN RUEDA FLORES PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC, DEANNA WILLIAMS, FRANCES MCLEOD, JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO, PETER JIMENEZ'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COUNSEL DIRECTED TO MEET AND CONFER REGARDING NEW TRIAL DATE.; SUBSEQUENTLY, MATTER IS RECALLED; PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF COUNSEL:; TRIAL IS CONTINUED AS FOLLOWS:; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5-7 DAYS; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 02/07/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 02/11/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S30 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5-7 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC FOR FAX FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180803-0099 $11.00; 180803-0099-MC Reference Number 41914G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DEF ATTY IN SUPPORT OF DEFS MTN TO CONT TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER LAWANA VASQUEZ 12582; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY NICHOLAUS BUCHOLZ PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY JUSTIN RUEDAFLORES PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR EX-PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; EX PARTE ORDERS DENIED; THE COURT FINDS NO BASIS FOR EX-PARTE RELIEF.; THE COURT TREATS THE EX-PARTE APPLICATION AS A REQUEST FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND GRANTS; THAT REQUEST. MATTER IS SET FOR HEARING ON 8/9/18.; HEARINGS:; LAW & MOTION RE: TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL DATE SET FOR 08/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S30A.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TO CONT. TRIAL TO BE HEARD ON 08/02/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC, DEANNA WILLIAMS, FRANCES MCLEOD, JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO, PETER JIMENEZ FOR FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 180801-0364 $57.00; 180801-0364-MC Reference Number 35924G

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2017
  • PARTY JENNIFER WEISBART-MORENO UPDATED: DEF NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PARTY LOMAS PRIVADAS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC UPDATED: CORRECTED NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DONALD TUREK FOR NEW FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0673 $435.00; 170914-0673-CK Reference Number 119872

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DONALD TUREK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less