This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:30:58 (UTC).

DONAHOE-V-SORBELLO

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 DONAHOE-V-SORBELLO was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2091

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Minor

KORYN DONAHOE

Petitioner and Cross Defendant

SARAH DONAHOE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHERISE SORBELLO

FRANK SORBELLO

Cross Defendants

SIMON DONAHOE

SARAH DONAHOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Minor, Cross Defendant and Petitioner Attorney

TIMOTHY J RYAN ANDASSOCIATES

8072 Warner Avenue

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A HAUSER

1551 North Tustin Ave, Suite 830

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

MOTION RE: MANDATORY TSC PREF SET FOR HEARING ON 04/05/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KORYN DONAHOE (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: MANDATORY TSC PREF SET FOR HEARING ON 04/05/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KORYN DONAHOE (IMAGED)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/23/2017 OF FRANK SORBELLO FILED BY FRANK SORBELLO, WITH PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/23/2017 OF FRANK SORBELLO FILED BY FRANK SORBELLO, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF FRANK SORBELLO, ON 08/01/17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE SET FOR HEARING ON 04/05/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANK SORBELLO, CHERISE SORBELLO (IMAGED)

OPPOSITION TO MOTION RE: TRIAL SETTING PREFERENCE SET FOR HEARING ON 04/05/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT FRANK SORBELLO, CHERISE SORBELLO (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0720 $435.00; 170206-0720-CK Reference Number #464271

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/23/2017 OF FRANK SORBELLO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/23/2017 OF FRANK SORBELLO - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KORYN DONAHOE BY SARAH DONAHOE.

SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KORYN DONAHOE BY SARAH DONAHOE.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $24,000.00 FILED.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $24,000.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FRANK SORBELLO, CHERISE SORBELLO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY FRANK SORBELLO, CHERISE SORBELLO.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHERISE SORBELLO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $35.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON CHERISE SORBELLO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/06/17 WITH COSTS OF $35.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KORYN DONAHOE BY FRANK SORBELLO

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KORYN DONAHOE BY FRANK SORBELLO

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KORYN DONAHOE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KORYN DONAHOE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR KORYN DONAHOE IS SARAH DONAHOE -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID COHN.

PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR KORYN DONAHOE IS SARAH DONAHOE -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID COHN.

DECLARATION OF LORI M. CULLMAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO TSC PREFRNCE FILED

DECLARATION OF LORI M. CULLMAN IN SUPPORT OF OPPO TO TSC PREFRNCE FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FRANK SORBELLO SERVED ON 03/06/17 WITH FEES OF $125.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FRANK SORBELLO SERVED ON 03/06/17 WITH FEES OF $125.00.

ANSWER FILED BY SARAH DONAHOE, SIMON DONAHOE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY TIMOTHY J RYAN ANDASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY SARAH DONAHOE, SIMON DONAHOE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY TIMOTHY J RYAN ANDASSOCIATES.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $115,351.35 FILED.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $115,351.35 FILED.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 03/23/2017 OF FRANK SORBELLO FILED BY FRANK SORBELLO, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF FRANK SORBELLO, ON 08/01/17; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KORYN DONAHOE FILED BY KORYN DONAHOE, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF KORYN DONAHOE, ON 07/31/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $24,000.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $115,351.35 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF MINOR'S CLAIM FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DAVID COHN, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT C TURKAL; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY TIMOTHY RYAN PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PETITIONER/GAL SARAH DONAHOE PRESENT.; PETITIONER/MINOR KORYN DONAHUE PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR PETITION FOR COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OF MINOR.; COURT FINDS:; COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION TRUE AND THE PETITION IS GRANTED.; SETTLEMENT APPROVED IN THE SUM OF $200,000.00; ATTORNEY FEES OF $50,000.00 AND EXPENSES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,251.45 ARE APPROVED.; MEDICAL EXPENSES IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,397.20.; THE BALANCE OF $24,000.00 IS ORDERED DEPOSITED IN A TRUST ACCOUNT WITH THE PETITIONER AS TRUSTEE AT SURF CITY BANK, HUNTINGTON BEACH, CA WITH NO FUNDS TO BE WITHDRAWN WITHOUT FIRST OBTAINING ORDER OF COURT UNTIL THE MINOR ATTAINS THE; AGE OF 18 YEARS.; IT IS ORDERED THAT THE BALANCE OF $115,351.35 BE USED TO PURCHASE AN ANNUITY; ORDERS APPROVING COMPROMISE AND TO DEPOSIT FUNDS ARE SIGNED BY THE COURT.; COUNSEL FOR PETITIONER IS ORDERED TO APPEAR ON THE CONTINUANCE DATE IF PROOF OF DEPOSIT/PROOF; OF ANNUITY PURCHASE HAS NOT BEEN FILED WITH THE COURT PRIOR TO THE HEARING DATE.; NO APPEARANCE REQUIRED PROVIDED RETURN IS FILED WITH THE COURT PRIOR TO DATE OF CONTINUANCE.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF PROOF OF DEPOSIT/PROOF OF ANNUITY SET FOR 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - MISCELLANEOUS PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 06/15/2017 OF SARAH DONAHOE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170224-0111 $1.50; 170224-0111-CK Reference Number 464409

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY KORYN DONAHOE FOR MOTION; Minutes; Receipt: 170217-0842 $90.00; 170217-0842-CK Reference Number #464362

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION RE: MANDATORY TSC PREF SET FOR HEARING ON 04/05/17, FILED BY PLAINTIFF KORYN DONAHOE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF KORYN DONAHOE - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR KORYN DONAHOE IS SARAH DONAHOE -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY DAVID COHN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0720 $435.00; 170206-0720-CK Reference Number #464271

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.