This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 21:28:46 (UTC).

DOLLAR LOAN VS CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 DOLLAR LOAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASTILLO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8305

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC

Defendant

JUDIE CASTILLO

 

Court Documents

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC FILED.

STIPULATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS FILED.

STIPULATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0302 $100.00; 171030-0302-EZ Reference Number 96J825013V452911

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JUDIE CASTILLO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JUDIE CASTILLO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • WRIT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST WAIT 30 DAYS AFTER NEJX IS SENT TO SSUE WRIT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 07/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • WRIT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • FWRD ORDR DFLT PAY TO FWRD ADRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • RETURN MAIL: ORDR DFLT PAY-JUDIE CASTILLO RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE-W/FWRD ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF ORDER ON SC-105A AND SC-225 SENT.; Minutes; ORDER ON SC-105A AND SC-225; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS GRANTED.; Minutes; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JEANNA CASTILLO; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC, JUDIE CASTILLO; COURT ORDERS DISMISSAL SET ASIDE AND VACATED; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 10/30/2017 OF DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC ORDERED SET ASIDE.; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC SET ASIDE.; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT JUDIE CASTILLO.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 10/30/2017 OF DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC ORDERED ENTERED 06/07/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUDIE CASTILLO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,087.45 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,087.45; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • ORDER PAYMENTS ARE TERMINATED AND THE BALANCE OF THE JUD GMENT IS COLLECTIBLE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • REQ FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL AFTER COURT ORD ARB BEFORE TRIAL (CI; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:49; DONNA CONNALLY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; DOLLAR LOAN CENTERCALIFORNIA,LLC REPRESENTED BY REBECCA ANDERSON.; DEFENDANT JUDIE CASTILLO PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PER STIPULATION CCP 664.6.; 10:50; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO JUDIE CASTILLO. PARTY SERVED ON 11/03/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS); Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0302 $100.00; 171030-0302-EZ Reference Number 96J825013V452911

    Read MoreRead Less