This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:07:34 (UTC).

DNF -V- ERVIN

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 DNF -V- ERVIN was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8654

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DNF ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

PATTI ERVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

420 N. Wabash Ave., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY DNF ASSOCIATES LLC

DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY DNF ASSOCIATES LLC

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO PATTI ERVIN WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,134.39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DNF ASSOCIATES LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED BY DNF ASSOCIATES LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DNF ASSOCIATES LLC FOR FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170929-0420 $196.00; 170929-0420-CK Reference Number 9268

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less