This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:16:23 (UTC).

DNF-V-BEJARANO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 DNF-V-BEJARANO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9099

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DNF ASSOCIATES LLC

Defendant

JAIME BEJARANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDARICH LAW GROUP, LLP

420 N. Wabash Ave., Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60611

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO JAIME BEJARANO WITH COSTS OF $65.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF VENUE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DNF ASSOCIATES LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,879.49

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DNF ASSOCIATES LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170928-0669 $196.00; 170928-0669-CK Reference Number 9269

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less