This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:23:19 (UTC).

DITECH-V-MORENO

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 DITECH-V-MORENO was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1467

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

WILMINGTON TRUST COMPANY AS OWNER TRUSTEE

Defendant

FRANCISCO A MORENO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS, LLP

1770 Fourth Ave

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY FRANCISCO A MORENO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY FRANCISCO A MORENO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FRANCISCO A MORENO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $61.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FRANCISCO A MORENO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $61.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF DITECH FINANCIAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLAINTIFF WILMINGTON TRUST COMPANY AS OWNER TRUSTEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF DITECH FINANCIAL LLC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF REQUIREMENTS FOR TRIAL-DEPT S32 BY MAIL ON 08/06/18 AS TO FRANCISCO A MORENO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HEARING DATE FOR MOTION BY MAIL ON 08/06/18 AS TO DEF, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • NOTICE CHANGE OF HEARING DATE FOR MTN FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEN FILED BY WILMINGTON TRUST COMPANY AS OWNER TRUSTEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY WILMINGTON TRUST COMPANY AS OWNER TRUSTEE FOR MSJ; Minutes; Receipt: 180731-1052 $530.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF MSJ AND SUPPORTING DOCS/PROPOSED ORDER BY OVERNIGHT MAIL ON 07/26/18 AS TO FRANCISCO A MORENO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY FRANCISCO A MORENO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY FRANCISCO A MORENO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FRANCISCO A MORENO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $61.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0512 $435.00; 171030-0512-CK Reference Number CK 107726

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less