This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:55:09 (UTC).

DISCOVER -V- STEELE

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 DISCOVER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STEELE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7956

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

EDWARD A STEELE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL, HAMMER & WHITE,APC.

P.O. Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/22/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EDWARD A STEELE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,530.66 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,840.16; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON EDWARD A STEELE.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON EDWARD A STEELE.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDWARD A STEELE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDWARD A STEELE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 2937.96 ); Minutes; Receipt: 180629-0688 $25.00; 180629-0688-CK Reference Number 741627

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $72.80)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/22/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: EDWARD A STEELE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,530.66 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,840.16; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON EDWARD A STEELE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO EDWARD A STEELE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DISCOVER BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,530.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 09/14/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0636 $240.00; 170915-0636-CK Reference Number CK 53073

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant