This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 09:08:39 (UTC).

DISCOVER -V- ALLEN

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 DISCOVER -V- ALLEN was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3285

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ROBERT ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

110 E Wilshire Avenue Suite 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 5353.41 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180207-0885 $25.00; 180207-0885-CK Reference Number 0780553

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $149.03)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 171116-0778 $25.00; 171116-0778-CK Reference Number 0767561

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: AMOUNT PRAYED FOR IN COMPLAINT FOR COMMON COUNTS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DECLARATION RE:UNDERLYING ACTION OF ACCOUNT STATED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 10/03/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT ALLEN; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,860.63 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $318.75 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,179.38; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO ROBERT ALLEN.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ROBERT ALLEN SERVED ON 08/06/17 WITH FEES OF $78.75.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,860.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0095 $240.00; 170713-0095-CK Reference Number 0747042

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less