This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:02:59 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK-V-WOODARD

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 DISCOVER BANK-V-WOODARD was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1690

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WILSON E. WOODARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZWICKER AND ASSOCIATES PC

700 N. Brand Boulevard Ste. 500

Glendale, CA 91203

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,564.53

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,564.53

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO INCUR COURT COSTS AND LEGAL FEES BY FILING SUIT FILED.

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO INCUR COURT COSTS AND LEGAL FEES BY FILING SUIT FILED.

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 11/20/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILSON E. WOODARD; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,260.03 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $304.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,564.53; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DECLARATION RE: CCP1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: CCP1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WILSON E. WOODARD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $64.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WILSON E. WOODARD; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/08/17 WITH COSTS OF $64.50 FILED.

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO INCUR COURT COSTS AND LEGAL FEES BY FILING SUIT FILED.

NOTICE OF INTENTION TO INCUR COURT COSTS AND LEGAL FEES BY FILING SUIT FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WILSON E. WOODARD FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WILSON E. WOODARD FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED; JUDGMENT IS FULLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,564.53

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTENTION TO INCUR COURT COSTS AND LEGAL FEES BY FILING SUIT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 11/20/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILSON E. WOODARD; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,260.03 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $304.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,564.53; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST WILSON E. WOODARD FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 12/14/2016 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO WILSON E. WOODARD.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 161221-0406 $240.00; 161221-0406-CK Reference Number 992716

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,948.03

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 12/14/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.