This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:22:43 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -V- KOPITSKY

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 DISCOVER BANK -V- KOPITSKY was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8067

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WILLIAM T KOPITSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL & HAMMER APC

Po Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/11/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM T KOPITSKY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,801.72 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,111.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WILLIAM T KOPITSKY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WILLIAM T KOPITSKY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WILLIAM T KOPITSKY.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WILLIAM T KOPITSKY.

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES OF LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES OF LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0220 $240.00; 170918-0220-CK Reference Number 51731

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 6414.39 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 180730-0765 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $278.17)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/11/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: WILLIAM T KOPITSKY; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,801.72 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,111.22; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES OF LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON WILLIAM T KOPITSKY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO WILLIAM T KOPITSKY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON WILLIAM T KOPITSKY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/21/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0220 $240.00; 170918-0220-CK Reference Number 51731

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less