This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:22:37 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -V- JORDA

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 DISCOVER BANK -V- JORDA was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8066

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

SANDIE JORDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL & HAMMER APC

Po Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0213 $240.00; 170918-0213-CK Reference Number 50757

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SANDIE JORDA WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SANDIE JORDA WITH COSTS OF $69.50

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SANDIE JORDA WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SANDIE JORDA WITH COSTS OF $69.50

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SANDIE JORDA WITH COSTS OF $69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO SANDIE JORDA WITH COSTS OF $69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0213 $240.00; 170918-0213-CK Reference Number 50757

    Read MoreRead Less