This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:24:33 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK V DUBELLAY ORTIZ

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DUBELLAY ORTIZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8087

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL & HAMMER, APC

P.O. Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/01/18 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/01/18 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 04/30/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,382.83 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,692.33; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO LAURIE G DUBELLAY ORTIZ WITH COSTS OF $69.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0955 $240.00; 170915-0955-CK Reference Number CK-49789

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less