This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 04:22:28 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -V- DENNIS

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DENNIS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8064

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

DONNA L DENNIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUTTELL & HAMMER APC

Po Box C-90006

Bellevue, WA 98009

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/05/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DONNA L DENNIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,764.75 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,074.25; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DONNA L DENNIS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DONNA L DENNIS.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 585(D) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: CCP 585(D) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DONNA L DENNIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DONNA L DENNIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0201 $240.00; 170918-0201-CK Reference Number 50761

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 01/05/18; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DONNA L DENNIS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,764.75 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,074.25; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DONNA L DENNIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO DONNA L DENNIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 585(D) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: IN SUPP OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON DONNA L DENNIS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/29/17 WITH COSTS OF $69.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 170918-0201 $240.00; 170918-0201-CK Reference Number 50761

    Read MoreRead Less