This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 12/09/2021 at 22:11:51 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK -V- BRIAN L RENTAS

Case Summary

On 07/20/2009 DISCOVER BANK filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BRIAN L RENTAS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Needles Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mapes, Steven A and Powers, Margaret A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0072

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mapes, Steven A

Powers, Margaret A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

RENTAS, BRIAN L

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mann Bracken, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/06/2010

DocketLegacy Minutes; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2010

DocketOSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2010

DispositionJudgment; Judicial Officer: Mapes, Steven A; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Court Ordered; Comment; Comment: (ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2010

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Mapes, Steven A; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL STEVEN A MAPES PRESIDING. CLERK: BEBEANNA FLETCHER COURT REPORTER IRV C SCHEIBE;1237 - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DISCOVER BANK, BRIAN L RENTAS - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - ON COURT'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF. - STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE - === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2010

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Original Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal; Judicial Officer: Mapes, Steven A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC RE: DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2010

DocketLegacy Minutes; Judicial Officer: Powers, Margaret A; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 MARGARET A POWERS PRESIDING. CLERK: BEBEANNA FLETCHER COURT REPORTER IRV C SCHEIBE;1237 - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DISCOVER BANK, BRIAN L RENTAS - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 02/02/10 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT N1 - ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END ===

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2010

DocketOSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Original Type: OSC Re: Service Completion Pursuant to CRC 3.740; Judicial Officer: Powers, Margaret A; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held; Comment: OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2009

DocketMiscellaneous Document Filed; Comment: NON SERVICE/RETURN FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2009

FinancialCONV; Counter Payment; Receipt # 20090721-0523; ConversionPayment; $215.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2009

FinancialCONV; Transaction Assessment; $215.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

FinancialCONV; Total Financial Assessment: $215.00; Total Payments and Credits: $215.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

DocketDeclaration re:; Comment: DECLARATION RE: PURSUANT TO CCP 395(B) FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

DocketParties Referred to Alternate Dispute Resolution; Comment: PARTIES REFERRED TO ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT N1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2009

DocketCase and Party Information added; Comment: CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED 090721-0523-CK CLT/ 215.00 PAYMT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less