This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 09:05:25 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK-V-BIBIANO

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 DISCOVER BANK-V-BIBIANO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9702

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

VERONICA C BIBIANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE MOORE LAW GROUP

3710 S Susan Street Suite 210

Santa Ana, CA 92704

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED.

STATEMENT OF CASE FILED.

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 12/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERONICA C BIBIANO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,231.58 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,536.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VERONICA C BIBIANO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VERONICA C BIBIANO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VERONICA C BIBIANO.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VERONICA C BIBIANO.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 180306-0240 $25.00; 180306-0240-CK Reference Number 970818

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDMGENT/COPY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 02/22/18 AS TO VERONICA C BIBIANO, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY DISCOVER BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK ORDERED ENTERED 12/22/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DISCOVER BANK; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VERONICA C BIBIANO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,231.58 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $305.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,536.58; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VERONICA C BIBIANO; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VERONICA C BIBIANO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 10/04/2017 OF DISCOVER BANK AS TO VERONICA C BIBIANO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171006-0385 $240.00; 171006-0385-CK Reference Number 957135

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less