This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 17:08:12 (UTC).

DINGMAN FAMILY V RICHARDS

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 DINGMAN FAMILY filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RICHARDS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0733

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DINGMAN FAMILY TRUST

Defendants

JASON RICHARDS

ANSLEY RICHARDS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE TO OPPOSING PARTY FILED BY ANSLEY RICHARDS

DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE TO OPPOSING PARTY FILED BY ANSLEY RICHARDS

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FOR STAY OF EVICTION; Disposition: DENIED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FOR STAY OF EVICTION; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:04; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; COURT REPORTER ELAINE VANDENBERG 11159; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT JASON RICHARDS, ANSLEY RICHARDS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; JASON RICHARDS, ANSLEY RICHARDS'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EVICTION IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY WILLIAM GARRETT JR .; WITNESS -- ANSLEY RICHARDS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENDANT ANSLEY RICHARDS STATES FOR THE RECORD HER NAME IS ANSLEY KAST; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JASON RICHARDS, ANSLEY RICHARDS'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EVICTION IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FOR STAY OF EVICTION TO BE HEARD ON 05/19/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FOR STAY OF EVICTION TO BE HEARD ON 05/19/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4X.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( SB)

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:15 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:23; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR. PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DINGMAN FAMILY TRUST REPRESENTED BY CHARLOTTE VOLSCH.; DEFENDANT JASON RICHARDS PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ANSLEY RICHARDS; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ADVISED RE:COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM; NO OBJECTION RAISED. FAILURE TO OBJECT IS DEEMED A STIPULATION TO COMMISSIONER/ATTORNEY PRO TEM SITTING AS JUDGE PRO TEM.; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; DEFENDANT REQUESTS CONTINUANCE; PURSUANT TO EVIDENCE CODE 776 COUNSEL EXAMINES JASON RICHARDS.; WITNESS -- JASON RICHARDS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF REQUESTS JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS.; PLAINTIFF REQUESTS CASE IN CHIEF BE ADMITTED.; ANSLEY RICHARDS HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT FINDS:; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 04/04/2017 OF DINGMAN FAMILY TRUST ORDERED ENTERED 05/11/17; JUDGMENT FOR: DINGMAN FAMILY TRUST; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JASON RICHARDS, ANSLEY RICHARDS; POSSESSION ONLY; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JASON RICHARDS, ANSLEY RICHARDS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:15 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ANSLEY RICHARDS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ANSLEY RICHARDS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/06/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 04/06/17 WITH FEES OF $20.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANSLEY RICHARDS; PARTY SERVED ON 04/06/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $55.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ANSLEY RICHARDS; PARTY SERVED ON 04/06/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $55.00

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/11/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/11/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY JASON RICHARDS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY JASON RICHARDS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170404-0670 $255.00; 170404-0670-VS Reference Number 026-0023005139

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 05/12/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: EX PARTE NOTICE TO OPPOSING PARTY FILED BY ANSLEY RICHARDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FOR STAY OF EVICTION; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:04; JAMES J. HOSKING, JUDGE; CLERK: KARLA WOODS; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; COURT REPORTER ELAINE VANDENBERG 11159; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY WILLIAM GARRETT JR PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT JASON RICHARDS, ANSLEY RICHARDS PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; JASON RICHARDS, ANSLEY RICHARDS'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EVICTION IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY WILLIAM GARRETT JR .; WITNESS -- ANSLEY RICHARDS IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENDANT ANSLEY RICHARDS STATES FOR THE RECORD HER NAME IS ANSLEY KAST; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JASON RICHARDS, ANSLEY RICHARDS'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EVICTION IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANSLEY RICHARDS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANSLEY RICHARDS FOR 1ST PAPER FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANSLEY RICHARDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX-PARTE MOTION RE: FOR STAY OF EVICTION TO BE HEARD ON 05/19/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B4X.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY JASON RICHARDS IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON JASON RICHARDS FOR 1ST PAPER FILING FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ANSWER BY MAIL ON 04/11/17 AS TO PLAINTIFF, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY JASON RICHARDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY JASON RICHARDS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $33.33.--BEGINNING ON 04/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170404-0670 $255.00; 170404-0670-VS Reference Number 026-0023005139

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • UPDATE CASE NAME.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.