This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 07:48:48 (UTC).

DICKERSON-V-ALLISON MECHANICAL

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 DICKERSON-V-ALLISON MECHANICAL was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2910

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES M. DICKERSON

Defendant

ALLISON MECHANICAL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIMARCO/ARAUJO/MONTEVIDEO

1324 North Broadway

Santa Ana, CA 92706

Defendant Attorney

PARKER IBRAHIM & BERG LLC

695 Town Center Dr 16Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLISON MECHANICAL,INC. FOR STIP & ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 180831-0744 $20.00; 180831-0744-CK Reference Number 29185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONALD ALVAREZ, JUDGE; CLERK: MONICA REAL-RAMOS; COURT REPORTER MARY ANDERSON 10319; COURT ATTENDANT E ASHE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY ZAHRA AZIZ APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JAMES M. DICKERSON.; ATTORNEY SCOTT MONROE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALLISON MECHANICAL,INC..; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PARTIES ANNOUNCE READY FOR TRIAL.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 5-7 DAY(S).; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 10/11/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S23; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/15/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S23 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5-7 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JAMES M. DICKERSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR JAMES M. DICKERSON.; Minutes; Receipt: 180108-0890 $150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING HOLLINS LAW WITH PARKER IBRAHIM & BERG LLC AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ALLISON MECHANICAL,INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLISON MECHANICAL,INC. FOR FAX FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171214-0030 $5.00; 171214-0030-VS Reference Number 033-0045453185

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/11/2017 OF JAMES DICKERSON AS TO ALLISON MECHANICAL,INC. ADDING ATTORNEY PARKER IBRAHIM & BERG LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLISON MECHANICAL,INC. FOR FAX FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171024-0690 $5.00; 171024-0690-VS Reference Number #033-0038668226

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLISON MECHANICAL,INC. FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 170929-0875 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO ALLISON MECHANICAL,INC. SERVED ON 08/31/17 WITH FEES OF $92.05.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF JAMES M. DICKERSON FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES M. DICKERSON FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0552 $435.00; 170714-0552-CK Reference Number CK#098422

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less