This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/20/2020 at 18:18:07 (UTC).

DIAZ -V- NEW HORIZON FOODS

Case Summary

On 08/05/2011 DIAZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NEW HORIZON FOODS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7256

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Minor and Claimant

AILIN LIRA DIAZ

Petitioner

JOSE ANTONIO DIAZ

Defendants

NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC

CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES INC

KLEEN PLAY PLAY GROUND CONSTRUCTION,INC

Respondents

NEW HORIZON FOODS,LLC

KLEEN PLAY PLAY GROUND CONSTRUCTION, INC

CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

PAUL BRYAN GRAY

250 W First Street Suite 254

Claremont, CA 91711-4790

Petitioner Attorney

WHEELER, SCOTT E

250 West First St Suite 254

Claremont, CA 91711

Defendant Attorneys

BEVINS & GLAUSER

560 E. Hospitality Lane #460

San Bernardino, CA 92408-3545

HILLYARD, BARNES, & REINHOLTZ LLP

310 Goldenshore Blvd Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

NOTICE RE:PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS FILED BY JOSE ANTONIO DIAZ, AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

NOTICE RE:PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS FILED BY JOSE ANTONIO DIAZ, AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAI TH SETTLEMENT FILED

ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAI TH SETTLEMENT FILED; ; Minutes; ; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/05/2011 OF AILIN DIAZ AND ALL PARTIES SET ASIDE.; ; ; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 08/13/2012 OF JOSE DIAZ ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ; ; DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ; ; DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV);

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLE MENT FILED.

APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLE MENT FILED.

AMENDED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION FILED. (IMAGED)

AMENDED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION FILED. (IMAGED)

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $44,875.00 FILED.

ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY IN THE AMOUNT OF $44,875.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE FILED BY AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

NOTICE OF TRIAL AND NOTICE OF TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE FILED BY AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED.

PLAINTIFFS DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND JURY FEE DEPOSIT FILED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KLEEN PLAY PLAY GROUND CONSTRUCTION,INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY KLEEN PLAY PLAY GROUND CONSTRUCTION,INC.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY KLEEN PLAY PLAYGROUND CONSTRUCTION INC FILED.

AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY KLEEN PLAY PLAYGROUND CONSTRUCTION INC FILED.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CMC FILED BY AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CMC FILED BY AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF BEVINS & GLAUSER FOR NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC, CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES INC CHANGES ITS NAME TO BEVINS & GLAUSER FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF BEVINS & GLAUSER FOR NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC, CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES INC CHANGES ITS NAME TO BEVINS & GLAUSER FILED

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC, CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC, CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC, CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES INC.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC, CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES INC.

NOTICE OF CMC FILED BY AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

NOTICE OF CMC FILED BY AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 10/11/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2012
  • DocketVACATE OSCVF HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • DocketJURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketREADINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE RE:PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS FILED BY JOSE ANTONIO DIAZ, AILIN LIRA DIAZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2012
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: VERIFICATION OF DEPOSIT SET FOR 10/11/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.; Disposition: Continued; ; Minutes; ; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; ; ; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; ; ; NOT REPORTED; ; ; COURT ATTENDANT R ARAGON; ; ; ; ; APPEARANCES:; ; ; ATTORNEY PAUL BRYAN GRAY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ; ; ; ; PROCEEDINGS:; ; ; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ; ; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL FOR THE PLAINTIFF.; ; ; REASON: WAITING ON FINAL PAYMENT; ; ; ; ; HEARINGS:; ; ; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 11/07/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.; ; ; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ; ; ; ; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; ; VACATE JT HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/22/12 AT 09:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.; ; ; VACATE READI HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R11.;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAI TH SETTLEMENT FILED; ; Minutes; ; COURT ORDERS DISPOSITION OF COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/05/2011 OF AILIN DIAZ AND ALL PARTIES SET ASIDE.; ; ; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 08/13/2012 OF JOSE DIAZ ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ; ; DISPOSITION ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ; ; DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT SENT TO R11

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2011
  • DocketVACATE OSCSV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY NEW HORIZON FOODS LLC, CARL KARCHER ENTERPRISES INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BEVINS & GLAUSER.; ; Minutes; Receipt: 110919-1712 $790.00 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DocketPOS OF SUMMONS (2) IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): MUST HAVE DECLARATION OF MAILING WHEN SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2011
  • DocketFEE PAYMENT; ; Minutes; Receipt: 110812-0457 $12.00 ;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 08/05/2011 OF AILIN DIAZ - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION & ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR AILIN LIRA DIAZ IS JOSE ANTONIO DIAZ -GRANTED-. SIGNED BY JANET M FRANGIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; ; Minutes; Receipt: 110805-2412 $395.00 ; 110805-2412-CK Reference Number 3237

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less