This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/04/2018 at 23:42:06 (UTC).

DIASCIENCE VS MHILL ENTERPRISES

Case Summary

On 03/29/2010 DIASCIENCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MHILL ENTERPRISES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3347

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIASCIENCE CORP

Defendant

MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MELVIN L FRIEDLAND

255 North "D" Street Suite 311

San Bernardino, CA 92401-1714

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP ORDERED ENTERED 06/28/10; JUDGMENT FOR: DIASCIENCE CORP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,750.00 INTEREST $1,280.30 ATTORNEY FEES $1,000.00 COSTS $392.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $13,422.30; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC SERVED ON 04/23/10 WITH FEES OF $52.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC SERVED ON 04/23/10 WITH FEES OF $52.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC FILED.

DECLARATION OF CCP 585 FILED

DECLARATION OF CCP 585 FILED

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP AS TO DOES ONLY

CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED

CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 100408-2090 $340.00; 100408-2090-CK Reference Number 28984

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2012
  • FINAL RETURN TO COURT WRIT OF EXECUTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2010
  • ** VOID ** FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DIASCIENCE CORP FOR WRIT AND ABSTRACT; Minutes; Receipt: 100629-2020 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • VACATE OSCD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 13447.30 ); Minutes; Receipt: 100706-3368 $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP ORDERED ENTERED 06/28/10; JUDGMENT FOR: DIASCIENCE CORP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $10,750.00 INTEREST $1,280.30 ATTORNEY FEES $1,000.00 COSTS $392.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $13,422.30; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC SERVED ON 04/23/10 WITH FEES OF $52.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP AS TO MHILL ENTERPRISES,INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF CCP 585 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/29/2010 OF DIASCIENCE CORP AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 100408-2090 $340.00; 100408-2090-CK Reference Number 28984

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less