This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 06:56:06 (UTC).

SUZANNA GRACIA, ET AL -V- DIANE ROMERO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 SUZANNA GRACIA, -V- DIANE ROMERO was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8974

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Defendants

DIANE ROMERO

SUZANNA GRACIA

JUSTIN GRACIA

Defendants

SUZANNA GARCIA

JUSTIN GARCIA

DIANE ROMERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JAWLAKIAN LAW GROUP

21550 Oxnard St Suite 300

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

AKARAGIAN LAW, INC

6311 Wilshire Blvd Fl 2

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Defendant Attorney

KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS

3333 Fourteenth Street

Riverside, CA 92501

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DIANE ROMERO SERVED ON 11/07/17 WITH FEES OF $84.15.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DIANE ROMERO SERVED ON 11/07/17 WITH FEES OF $84.15.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DIANE ROMERO.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DIANE ROMERO.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SUZANNA GRACIA, JUSTIN GRACIA

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SUZANNA GRACIA, JUSTIN GRACIA

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF DIANE ROMERO AS TO SUZANNA GRACIA, JUSTIN GRACIA ADDING ATTORNEY AKARAGIAN LAW, INC FILED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF DIANE ROMERO AS TO SUZANNA GRACIA, JUSTIN GRACIA ADDING ATTORNEY AKARAGIAN LAW, INC FILED

NOTICE OF NEED TO FILE SUMMONS & CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SENT.

NOTICE OF NEED TO FILE SUMMONS & CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE: NO SUMMONS WAS ISSUED AT TIME OF FILING OF COMPLAINT. A CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; WAS NOT SUBMITTED FOR FILING AT TIME OF FILING OF COMPLAINT. THESE ARE JUDICIAL COUNCIL; MANDATORY FORMS. PLEASE SUBMIT A CORRECTED SUMMONS FOR ISSUANCE, AND A COMPLETED CIVIL CASE; COVER SHEET FOR FILING.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DIANE ROMERO

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DIANE ROMERO

ANSWER FILED BY DIANE ROMERO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS.

ANSWER FILED BY DIANE ROMERO; PARTY REPRESENTED BY KINKLE RODIGER & SPRIGGS.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF RETURNED ANSWER OF DENISE ROMERO SENT.

NOTICE OF RETURNED ANSWER OF DENISE ROMERO SENT.; Minutes; PARTY MUST ANSWER EXACTLY AS SUED OR STATE ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS. DENISE ROMERO IS NOT A; PARTY TO THIS ACTION. SEE ATTACHED.; NOTICES PRINTED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON HEARING ON 052818 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DIANE ROMERO FOR FAX FILING, COPY, PSTG/EVLP; Minutes; Receipt: 180611-0489 $7.21; 180611-0489-MC Reference Number 08267S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; WILFRED J SCHNEIDER JR., JUDGE; CLERK: KIM ALLAIN; COURT REPORTER CRAIG ANDERSON 11800; COURT ATTENDANT N PINGREY; APPEARANCES:; ADAM FEIT APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SUZANNA GRACIA, JUSTIN GRACIA.; ATTORNEY MICHAEL MOON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLEADINGS ARE PROPER AND THE ISSUES JOINED.; JURY DEMANDED BY BOTH PARTIES.; ESTIMATED LENGTH OF TRIAL 5 DAY(S).; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 01/17/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S32; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 01/22/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S32 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT (W/ COPY OF TRIAL REQUIREMENTS) TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SUZANNA GRACIA, JUSTIN GRACIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0058613402

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DIANE ROMERO FOR FAX FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 180315-0798 $3.00; 180315-0798-MC Reference Number MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY DIANE ROMERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/27/2017 OF DIANE ROMERO AS TO SUZANNA GRACIA, JUSTIN GRACIA ADDING ATTORNEY AKARAGIAN LAW, INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DIANE ROMERO FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF NEED TO FILE SUMMONS & CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE TAKE NOTICE: NO SUMMONS WAS ISSUED AT TIME OF FILING OF COMPLAINT. A CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET; WAS NOT SUBMITTED FOR FILING AT TIME OF FILING OF COMPLAINT. THESE ARE JUDICIAL COUNCIL; MANDATORY FORMS. PLEASE SUBMIT A CORRECTED SUMMONS FOR ISSUANCE, AND A COMPLETED CIVIL CASE; COVER SHEET FOR FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • SUMMONS IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PARTIES TO COMPLAINT MUST BE NAMED EXACTLY THE SAME AS ON SUMMONS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DIANE ROMERO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0040 $435.00; 170927-0040-CK Reference Number #D3566447; PLAINTIFFS SUZANNA GARCIA AND JUSTIN GARCIA PAID FIRST PAPER FEES.; THESE FEES ARE NOT PAID BY DIANE RAMERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less