This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/28/2018 at 19:07:49 (UTC).

DIAFERIO -V- CARPENTER

Case Summary

On 06/28/2018 DIAFERIO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARPENTER. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0217

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOUIS DIAFERIO

Defendants

JUSTIN L CARPENTER

BRITTANY KINSAY

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

, H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 W Orange Show Rd

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTYS OFFICE ON 7.24.18)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTYS OFFICE ON 7.24.18)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/28/2018 OF LOUIS DIAFERIO ORDERED ENTERED 07/18/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LOUIS DIAFERIO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUSTIN L CARPENTER, BRITTANY KINSAY; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JUSTIN L CARPENTER, BRITTANY KINSAY. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRITTANY KINSAY; PARTY SERVED ON 06/28/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRITTANY KINSAY; PARTY SERVED ON 06/28/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JUSTIN L CARPENTER, BRITTANY KINSAY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JUSTIN L CARPENTER, BRITTANY KINSAY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/28/18 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/28/18 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JUSTIN L CARPENTER; PARTY SERVED ON 06/28/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JUSTIN L CARPENTER; PARTY SERVED ON 06/28/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180628-0580 $255.00; 180628-0580-CK Reference Number 1194781

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180727-1007 $25.00; 180727-1007-CK Reference Number 1195589

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( WRIT MAILED TO ATTYS OFFICE ON 7.24.18)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/28/2018 OF LOUIS DIAFERIO AS TO JUSTIN L CARPENTER, BRITTANY KINSAY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/28/2018 OF LOUIS DIAFERIO ORDERED ENTERED 07/18/18; JUDGMENT FOR: LOUIS DIAFERIO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JUSTIN L CARPENTER, BRITTANY KINSAY; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JUSTIN L CARPENTER, BRITTANY KINSAY. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON BRITTANY KINSAY; PARTY SERVED ON 06/28/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JUSTIN L CARPENTER, BRITTANY KINSAY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/28/18 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JUSTIN L CARPENTER; PARTY SERVED ON 06/28/18 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 06/28/2018 OF LOUIS DIAFERIO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180628-0580 $255.00; 180628-0580-CK Reference Number 1194781

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.