This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2018 at 06:11:30 (UTC).

DEUTSCHE VS ZESATI

Case Summary

On 01/11/2010 DEUTSCHE filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ZESATI. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0012

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY

Defendant

VICTOR M ZESATI

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILES,BAUER,BERGSTROM & WINTERS

1231 East Dyer Road Suite 100

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY VICTOR M ZESATI; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 6:10-BK-14046-TD. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/12/10 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT CCC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2010
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY VICTOR M ZESATI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( RETURNED TO ATTY IN SASE); Minutes; Receipt: 100211-4516 $25.00; 100211-4516-CK Reference Number 628957

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 01/11/2010 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 02/11/10; JUDGMENT FOR: DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTOR M ZESATI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VICTOR M ZESATI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/11/2010 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TO VICTOR M ZESATI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 01/22/10 WITH FEES OF $70.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST VICTOR M ZESATI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON VICTOR M ZESATI; POSTED ON 01/22/10 WITH FEES OF $175.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 01/11/2010 OF DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100121-4701 $20.00; 100121-4701-CK Reference Number 117715

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 100111-2051 $235.00; 100111-2051-CK Reference Number 628114

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2010
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT C1

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.