This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 15:01:00 (UTC).

DESEREY E OCHOA -N- KEITH R HANKS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 DESEREY E OCHOA -N- KEITH R HANKS was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5894

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DESEREY ELIZABETH OCHOA

Respondent

KEITH ROBERT HANKS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 02/02/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • NOTICE/JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF DESEREY OCHOA FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF DESEREY OCHOA ORDERED ENTERED 12/11/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); VACATE STFL HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT SCC.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DEFAULT/JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON KEITH ROBERT HANKS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST KEITH ROBERT HANKS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE NO CHILDREN FILED 07/11/2017 OF DESEREY OCHOA AS TO KEITH ROBERT HANKS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DESEREY ELIZABETH OCHOA FOR PRELIM/WAIVE FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KEITH ROBERT HANKS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/01/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY DESEREY ELIZABETH OCHOA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY DESEREY ELIZABETH OCHOA IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON DESEREY ELIZABETH OCHOA FOR 1ST FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S49

    Read MoreRead Less