This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:11:47 (UTC).

DENNIS -V- LOERA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 DENNIS -V- LOERA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1402

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZEPPORAH DENNIS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA

ESPERANZA HERRERA-LOERA

EDWINA WARDER

ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA

Defendant and Cross Defendant

EDWINA WARDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMBERS & NORONHA

2070 North Tustin Ave

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

DOHERTY & CATLOW

801 South Grand Avenue Suite 200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES

1600 Iowa Avenue Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES

1600 Iowa Avenue Suite 200

Riverside, CA 92507

 

Court Documents

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ZEPPORAH DENNIS BY JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ZEPPORAH DENNIS BY JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DOHERTY & CATLOW.

ANSWER FILED BY JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DOHERTY & CATLOW.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY EDWINA WARDER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

ANSWER FILED BY EDWINA WARDER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDWINA WARDER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/21/18 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDWINA WARDER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 01/21/18 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY EDWINA WARDER

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY EDWINA WARDER

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • ANSWER FILED BY EDWINA WARDER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY BONNIE R. MOSS ANDASSOCIATES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA.; Minutes; Receipt: 180511-0440 $150.00; 180511-0440-CK Reference Number CK#21023

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GARY CHAMBERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ZEPPORAH DENNIS.; ATTORNEY PAUL SULLIVAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA, ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY DEMANDED BY DEFENDANTS.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5 DAYS; COURT ORDERS MATTER TO MEDIATION PURSUANT TO STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES.; CASE REFERRED TO COURT SPONSORED MEDIATION; HEARINGS:; THE COURT REFERS THIS MATTER TO A VOLUNTARY CIVIL MEDIATION SESSION. A ONE-HOUR BLOCK OF TIME HAS BEEN RESERVED FOR THIS PURPOSE AS FOLLOWS: 11/01/18 AT 01:30 IN DEPARTMENT S34.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 06/20/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/24/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EDWINA WARDER FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180417-0937 $435.00; 180417-0937-CK Reference Number 123231674

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • DEFENDANT EDWINA WARDER FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JOSE RAIGOZA LOERA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PARTY ESPERANZ HERRERA-LOERA UPDATED: CORRECTING PARTY NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ZEPPORAH DENNIS FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0126 $435.00; 171030-0126-CK Reference Number 64144

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ZEPPORAH DENNIS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less