This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:12:05 (UTC).

DENNIS -V- GALLEGOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 DENNIS -V- GALLEGOS was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1403

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZEPPORAH DENNIS

Defendants

JANET VALENCIA

MAYRA VALENCIA

VALERIA GALLEGOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMBERS & NORONHA

2070 North Tustin Ave

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorneys

WADE & LOWE , A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

15615 Alton Parkway Ste 270

Irvine, CA 92618

THARPE & HOWELL

15250 Ventura Blvd 9Th Floor

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

ANSWER FILED BY VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WADE & LOWE , A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION.

ANSWER FILED BY VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WADE & LOWE , A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JANET VALENCIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JANET VALENCIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VALERIA GALLEGOS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VALERIA GALLEGOS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/30/2017 OF ZEPPORAH DENNIS AS TO VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA ADDING ATTORNEY THARPE & HOWELL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DONNA GUNNELL GARZA, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA GABLE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY GARY CHAMBERS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ZEPPORAH DENNIS.; ATTORNEY RICHARD MILLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY DEMANDED BY DEFENDANTS.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 5 DAYS; IF COUNSEL ARE AMENABLE TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, THE COURT ORDERS MEDIATION TO BE COMPLETED 30 DAYS; PRIOR TO THE TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE.; HEARINGS:; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 06/06/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/10/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA.; Minutes; Receipt: 171212-0874 $150.00; 171212-0874-CK Reference Number 11346

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY WADE & LOWE , A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DEFENDANT VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA, MAYRA VALENCIA FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY MAYRA VALENCIA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171212-0869 $435.00; 171212-0869-CK Reference Number 11347

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY VALERIA GALLEGOS, JANET VALENCIA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171212-0867 $870.00; 171212-0867-CK Reference Number 11348

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VALERIA GALLEGOS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON MAYRA VALENCIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/09/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ZEPPORAH DENNIS FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ZEPPORAH DENNIS FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 171030-0158 $435.00; 171030-0158-CK Reference Number 64143

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less