This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 09:03:50 (UTC).

DENISE GILPIN/ BURNT MOUNTAIN MHP -V- PESSA

Case Summary

On 01/19/2017 DENISE GILPIN/ BURNT MOUNTAIN MHP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PESSA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0022

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DENISE GILPIN

Defendant

SHERRY PESSA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER THE COUNTER ON3/7/17)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER THE COUNTER ON3/7/17); Minutes; Receipt: 170307-0666 $25.00; 170307-0666-CK Reference Number 2486

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING SENT.

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING SENT.; Minutes; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, YOUR HEARING CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/17 AT 1:00PM IN DEPT M4 HAS; BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 02/24/17 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT M4.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:30 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY SHERRY PESSA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY SHERRY PESSA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SHERRY PESSA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/19/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SHERRY PESSA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 01/19/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170119-0648 $255.00; 170119-0648-CK Reference Number 2482

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $13.33.--BEGINNING ON 01/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( HANDED OVER THE COUNTER ON3/7/17); Minutes; Receipt: 170307-0666 $25.00; 170307-0666-CK Reference Number 2486

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170307-0607 $0.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:20 HRS.; Disposition: Stipulated Judgment Before Trial; Minutes; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: KIMBERLEY HANNA; COURT REPORTER ROWENA MASIH 7426; BAILIFF: S LEACH; PLAINTIFF DENISE GILPIN PRESENT; (ON SITE MANAGER FOR BURNT MOUNTAIN MHP); DEFENDANT SHERRY PESSA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; (SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES); WITNESS -- DENISE GILPIN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- SHERRY PESSA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; JUDGMENT ENTERED BY STIPULATION; JUDGMENT FOR: DENISE GILPIN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: SHERRY PESSA; DEFENDANT TO MOVE OUT OF PREMISES BY 04-01-17.; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:30 HRS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING SENT.; Minutes; ON COURTS OWN MOTION, YOUR HEARING CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR 02/17/17 AT 1:00PM IN DEPT M4 HAS; BEEN RESCHEDULED FOR 02/24/17 AT 1:00 PM IN DEPT M4.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SHERRY PESSA IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON SHERRY PESSA FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • PARTY SHERRY PESSA UPDATED: DEFENDANTS FIRST NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY SHERRY PESSA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON SHERRY PESSA; PARTY SERVED ON 01/19/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • ADA LETTER MAILED OUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170119-0648 $255.00; 170119-0648-CK Reference Number 2482

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4X

    Read MoreRead Less