This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 06:25:20 (UTC).

DEL ROSARIO -V- GRUMA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/23/2016 DEL ROSARIO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GRUMA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1843

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARACELI CONDE DEL ROSARIO

Defendant

GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAIRAVI LAW, P.C.

1875 Century Park East Suite 1025

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

CAROTHERS DISANTE & FREUDENBERGER

707 Wilshire Blvd Suite 5150

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF ORDER FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF ORDER FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION.

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.

NOTICE OF HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT A HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT HAS BEEN SET FOR; 08/09/17 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT S29 AT THE SAN BERNARDINO JUDICIAL CENTER.; NOTICES PRINTED

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:17-CV-00230.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:17-CV-00230.; Minutes; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO JANET M FRANGIE.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO JANET M FRANGIE.

ANSWER FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CAROTHERS DISANTE &FREUDENBERGER.

ANSWER FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CAROTHERS DISANTE &FREUDENBERGER.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE WAS DISMISSED AT HEARING ON 080917 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ORDER FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • HEARING RE: REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER KATHY SELLERS 4420; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; DAN M. FORMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT MATTER REMAINS IN FEDERAL COURT AND IS NOT LIKELY TO RETURN TO; SUPERIOR COURT.; COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: MATTER REMAINS IN FEDERAL COURT.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT A HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT HAS BEEN SET FOR; 08/09/17 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPT S29 AT THE SAN BERNARDINO JUDICIAL CENTER.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:17-CV-00230.; Minutes; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/03/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 7/03/17 AT 8:30 IN S29 - RESCHEDULED TO: IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET ON 7/03/17 AT 8:30 IN S28 IS RESCHEDULED TO AT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO JANET M FRANGIE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170206-0887 $435.00; 170206-0887-CK Reference Number CK 95233

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY GRUMA CORPORATION,A NEVADA CORPORATION; PARTY REPRESENTED BY CAROTHERS DISANTE &FREUDENBERGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • PLAINTIFF ARACELI CONDE DEL ROSARIO FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ARACELI CONDE DEL ROSARIO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161223-0397 $435.00; 161223-0397-CK Reference Number CK D3500725

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less