This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 03:33:39 (UTC).

DEL MECHANICAL -VS- PIZZERIA ORTICA

Case Summary

On 11/30/2015 DEL MECHANICAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PIZZERIA ORTICA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9587

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEL MECHANICAL

Defendant

PIZZERIA ORTICA

 

Court Documents

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR IMAGING OF CORRESPONDENC (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR IMAGING OF CORRESPONDENC (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE ORAP GRANTED FILED

ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE ORAP GRANTED FILED

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170123-0823 $10.00; 170123-0823-VS Reference Number VISA

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DEL MECHANICAL FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF DEL MECHANICAL FILED. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: DENIED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:20; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; DEL MECHANICAL REPRESENTED BY KRISTEN TYNES.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PIZZERIA ORTICA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; AUTHORIZATION FILED.; MOTION; PIZZERIA ORTICA'S MOTION VENUE CHALLENGE IS HEARD.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY PLAINTIFF .; PIZZERIA ORTICA'S MOTION VENUE CHALLENGE IS DENIED.; PIZZERIA ORTICA HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; KRISTEN TYNES IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST PIZZERIA ORTICA.; JUDGMENT FOR: DEL MECHANICAL; JUDGMENT AGAINST: PIZZERIA ORTICA; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $790.87 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $885.87; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:24; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO PIZZERIA ORTICA. PARTY SERVED ON 03/05/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO PIZZERIA ORTICA. PARTY SERVED ON 03/05/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00. (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 151204-1021 $30.00; 151204-1021-CK Reference Number CK

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2017
  • REQ TO CORRECT OR CANCEL JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • REQUEST TO CORRECT JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): THE TIME FRAME FOR THIS FORM TO BE FILED HAS NOW E XPIRED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; NOT RECORDED; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DEL MECHANICAL, PIZZERIA ORTICA; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCES; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR REJECTED DOCUMENT NOTICE (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • LETTER RE: CHANGE OF VENUE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): YOU MUST SUBMIT THE CORRECT PAPERWORK TO TAKE FURTHER ACTION ON CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • VENUE CHALLENGE>FAX RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR IMAGING OF CORRESPONDENC (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL ORDER ON REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO PIZZERIA ORTICA. PARTY SERVED ON 03/05/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $65.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • PROOF & CHALLENGE OF VENUE LETTER RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • JURISDICTIONAL CHALLENGE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • LETTER CHALLENGING VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • REQ TO POSTPONE RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; NOT RECORDED; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; DEL MECHANICAL REPRESENTED BY PETER DELUCA.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PIZZERIA ORTICA; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: NEED SERVICE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/14/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • CHANGE CASE CATEGORY FROM ISCB TO ISCL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 151204-1021 $30.00; 151204-1021-CK Reference Number CK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.