Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 03:58:11 (UTC).

DECARLO -VS- DELEON; STANYON

Case Summary

On 06/16/2017 DECARLO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DELEON STANYON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4158

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPH DECARLO

SUSAN DECARLO

Defendants

ROBERT ADAM DELEON

JAYNE STANYON

REBECCA DELEON

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

, DURINGER LAW GROUP, PLC

160 S. Old Springs Rd Ste 135

Anaheim, CA 92808

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/16/2017 OF JOSEPH DECARLO ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOSEPH DECARLO, SUSAN DECARLO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT ADAM DELEON, REBECCA DELEON, JAYNE STANYON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ROBERT ADAM DELEON, REBECCA DELEON, JAYNE STANYON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JAYNE STANYON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JAYNE STANYON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/19/17 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 06/19/17 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JAYNE STANYON SERVED ON 06/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JAYNE STANYON SERVED ON 06/19/17 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERT ADAM DELEON, REBECCA DELEON FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ROBERT ADAM DELEON, REBECCA DELEON FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROBERT ADAM DELEON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/19/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ROBERT ADAM DELEON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/19/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON REBECCA DELEON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/19/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON REBECCA DELEON; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 06/19/17

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO DAVID A WILLIAMS.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO DAVID A WILLIAMS.

COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2017
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 170713-0263 $25.00; 170713-0263-CK Reference Number 013842

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SHERIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • RTS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 06/16/2017 OF JOSEPH DECARLO ORDERED ENTERED 07/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOSEPH DECARLO, SUSAN DECARLO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROBERT ADAM DELEON, REBECCA DELEON, JAYNE STANYON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ROBERT ADAM DELEON, REBECCA DELEON, JAYNE STANYON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JAYNE STANYON, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 06/20/2017
  • HEARING RE: 170.6; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSEPH DECARLO, SUSAN DECARLO, ROBERT ADAM DELEON, REBECCA DELEON, JAYNE STANYON; PROCEEDINGS:; CCP170.6 FILED AS TO JUDGE DAVID A WILLIAMS, CASE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE LYNN PONCIN FOR ALL PURPOSES.; CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7; CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY PARTY OF NEW DEPARTMENT ASSIGNMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER CCP 170.6 AS TO DAVID A WILLIAMS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSEPH DECARLO, SUSAN DECARLO FOR COPIES; Minutes; Receipt: 170616-0469 $3.00; 170616-0469-CS Reference Number CASH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $46.66.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170616-0461 $255.00; 170616-0461-CK Reference Number CK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,268.40

    Read MoreRead Less