This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 11:25:27 (UTC).

DEBT RESOLVE-V-PARKER

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 DEBT RESOLVE-V-PARKER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0663

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBT RESOLVE, LLC

Defendant

KEYSII S. PARKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KENOSIAN & MIELE, LAW OFFICES OF

8581 Santa Monica Blvd #17

Los Angeles, CA 90069

 

Court Documents

S-17S TRIAL SETTING ORDERS FILED.

S-17S TRIAL SETTING ORDERS FILED.

NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL AND PRETRIAL ORDER FILED BY DEBT RESOLVE, LLC.

NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL AND PRETRIAL ORDER FILED BY DEBT RESOLVE, LLC.

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN R. FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT KEYSII S. PARKER PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:23; TRIAL REQUESTED.; JURY WAIVED; CASE TO PROCEED AS TO NON-JURY TRIAL.; TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 2 HOURS; TRIAL SETTING ORDERS ISSUED.; BENCH TRIAL: ORDER: EACH SIDE IS ORDERED TO FILE WITH THE COURT AND EXCHANGE WITH OPPOSING; PARTIES, THE FOLLOWING: [1] TRIAL BRIEF, [2] WITNESS LIST, AND [3] EXHIBIT LIST, PROPERLY; PAGE-NUMBERED, TABBED AND INDEXED, PURSUANT TO PARAGRAPHS (C )(F) OF CRC 3.1110, 10 DAYS PRIOR; TO TRIAL. ANY CCP 98 DECLARATION MUST BE SERVED AT LEAST 30 DAYS PRIOR TO TRIAL AND IN; COMPLIANCE WITH THAT STATUE. VIOLATION OF THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN MONETARY SANCTIONS,; EXCLUSION OF EVIDENCE AND/OR WITNESSES.; "REQUIREMENTS OF TRIAL" HANDED TO ALL PARTIES; HEARINGS:; COURT TRIAL ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/19/2017 OF DEBT RESOLVE, LLC IS SET FOR 08/10/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S17; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON COURT FEES FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON COURT FEES FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

ANSWER FILED BY KEYSII S. PARKER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY KEYSII S. PARKER; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KEYSII S. PARKER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON KEYSII S. PARKER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/30/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLED); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DEBT RESOLVE, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • COURT TRIAL SET FOR REDUCED COLLECTIONS FILED 10/19/2017 OF DEBT RESOLVE, LLC; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JESSICA MORALES; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: KEYSII S. PARKER; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:09; COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT A NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT WILL BE SUBMITTED.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL (SETTLED) SET FOR 10/12/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:10; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY DEBT RESOLVE, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • PLTFS LIST OF EXHIBITS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2017
  • PLAINTIFF DEBT RESOLVE, LLC FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DEBT RESOLVE, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171020-0073 $196.00; 171020-0073-CK Reference Number 21392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REDUCED FILING FEES BP6322.1(C)(1) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,274.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED. (LIMITED JURISDICTION - DEC BP6322.1(C)(1)).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less