This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:26:25 (UTC).

DE GRAAF-V-FIRST STUDENT, INC ET AL (MF)

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 DE GRAAF-V-FIRST STUDENT, INC MF was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4739

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CATHERINE DE GRAAF

BRENDA ESCOBAR

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FIRST STUDENT, INC.

HESPERIA UNITED SCHOOL DISTRICT

BRENDA ESCOBAR

JULIE ANN JANSSENS

HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JULIE ANN JANSSENS

HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

FIRST STUDENT, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BULLARD & POWELL

198 North Arrowhead Ave Ste 4

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LAW OFFICES OF BARRY S ZELNER

16055 Ventura Boulevard Suite 505

Encino, CA 91436

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH

650 E. Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FORD, WALKER, HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

 

Court Documents

MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CATHERINE DE GRAAF (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT SET FOR HEARING ON 08/01/19, FILED BY PLAINTIFF CATHERINE DE GRAAF (IMAGED)

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CATHERINE DE GRAAF.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CATHERINE DE GRAAF.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/12/19 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/12/19 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JULIE ANN JANSSENS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/12/19 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JULIE ANN JANSSENS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/12/19 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FIRST STUDENT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/15/18 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON FIRST STUDENT, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/15/18 WITH COSTS OF $60.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JULIE ANN JANSSENS SERVED ON 11/21/18 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO JULIE ANN JANSSENS SERVED ON 11/21/18 WITH FEES OF $95.00.

ANSWER FILED BY HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

ANSWER FILED BY HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY FIRST STUDENT, INC., JULIE ANN JANSSENS.

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES FILED BY FIRST STUDENT, INC., JULIE ANN JANSSENS.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/25/2018 OF BRENDA ESCOBAR - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/25/2018 OF BRENDA ESCOBAR - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BRENDA ESCOBAR

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY BRENDA ESCOBAR

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/10/18 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/10/18 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JULIE ANN JANSSENS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/18 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JULIE ANN JANSSENS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/18 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 180920-0123 $435.00

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (06/10/19) FILED BY PLAINTIFF CATHERINE DE GRAAF; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • VACATE L&M HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/01/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE 1ST AMENDED FILED BY CATHERINE DE GRAAF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH CASE(S) CIVDS1826333 MASTER FILE CIVDS1824739

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONSOLIDATION W/ CIVDS1824739 (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: CONSOLIDATION W/CIVDS1826333; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; MICHAEL A SACHS, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SARAH POWELL PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY MATTHEW WALKER PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS FIRST STUDENT, HESPERIA USD, J. JANSSEN.; ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER P. CHANG PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT BRENDA ESCOBAR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT FINDS THERE IS NO OPPOSITION TO CONSOLIDATION OF THE TWO CASES.; ACTION CONSOLIDATED PHYSICALLY WITH CIVDS1826333 -- CASE # CIVDS1824739 DEEMED MASTER FILE.; COURT ADVISES PARTIES THAT THEY ARE REQUIRED TO PARTICIPATE IN SOME FORM OF ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE; RESOLUTION PRIOR TO TRIAL. PRIOR TO FILING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES AND/OR MOTION TO; QUASH PARTIES MUST SCHEDULE AN INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE WITH THE COURT; (CCP2016.080). FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS COURTS ORDER WILL RESULT IN SANCTIONS. COUNSEL; MAY CALL THE CLERK IN THE DEPARTMENT DIRECTLY TO SCHEDULE AN MSC AND/OR INFORMAL DISCOVERY; CONFERENCE. (909.708.8698); HEARINGS:; HEARING DATE OF 08/01/19 CONFIRMED.; HEARING DATE OF 07/16/20 CONFIRMED.; HEARING DATE OF 07/20/20 CONFIRMED.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY FIRST STUDENT, INC, HESPERIA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, JULIE ANN JANSSENS; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY CATHERINE DE GRAAF FOR MOTION; Minutes; Receipt: 190610-0885 $90.00; 190610-0885-VS Reference Number 033-0133055487

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/20/2018 OF CATHERINE DE GRAAF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BRENDA ESCOBAR; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/18 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JULIE ANN JANSSENS; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/26/18 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0087401362

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 180920-0123 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.