This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/16/2018 at 06:08:39 (UTC).

D&C INVESTMENT VS MARQUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/25/2011 D C INVESTMENT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARQUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Chino District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0056

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chino District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D&C INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, LP

Defendants

LILLY CARNERO MARQUEZ

RALPH SEVILLA JR

LAURA MARIE FERNANDEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160223-0792 $25.00; 160223-0792-CK Reference Number 40745

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • ABSTRACT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • ABSTRACT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT AGAINST 3 INDIVIDUALS BUT ONLY ONE LISTED-PLEASE RETURN PER S BREMER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2015
  • UPDATE JURISDICTION TO FS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED UNABLE TO FWD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED UNABLE TO FWD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/11/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • STIPULATION RE: APPOINTMENT OF COURT BENCH OFFICER PRO TEMPORE FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2011
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; STEPHANIE THORNTON-HARRIS, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: PATTY PENMAN; D&C INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, LP REPRESENTED BY STEVEN BREMMER.; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; 10:30; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF JUDGE PRO TEM FILED.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LILLY CARNERO MARQUEZ, LAURA MARIE FERNANDEZ, RALPH SEVILLA JR.; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT D&C INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, LP HAVE &; RECOVER FROM LILLY CARNERO MARQUEZ, LAURA MARIE FERNANDEZ, RALPH SEVILLA JR:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,134.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $110.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,244.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); CONTRACT CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO LILLY CARNERO MARQUEZ. PARTY SERVED ON 01/26/11. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $10.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF D&C INVESTMENT PROPERTIES, LP FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110125-1571 $100.00; 110125-1571-CK Reference Number 034534

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.