This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 10:25:02 (UTC).

DAVIS -V- THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/11/2015 DAVIS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6675

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD DAVIS

Defendant

THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNOWLES, VICTORIA C

4100 Newport Place Dr Suite 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART P.C.

400 South Hope Street Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF REMOVED ACTION FILED BY EDWARD DAVIS.

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF REMOVED ACTION FILED BY EDWARD DAVIS.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF A HEARING FOR STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.

NOTICE OF A HEARING FOR STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; A HEARING FOR STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT HAS BEEN SET FOR 10-13-15 AT 8:30AM; IN DEPT S33.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:15-CV-01367.

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT FILED BY THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC. FEDERAL NUMBER 5:15-CV-01367.

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC.

NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC.

ANSWER FILED BY THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART P.C..

ANSWER FILED BY THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART P.C..

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/08/15 WITH COSTS OF $105.25 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/08/15 WITH COSTS OF $105.25 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF REMOVED ACTION FILED BY EDWARD DAVIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COURT.; REASON: UPDATE OF STATUS OF REMOVAL; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/02/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2015
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2015
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRYAN F FOSTER, JUDGE; CLERK: NADYA AVAKIAN; COURT REPORTER KIMBERLY MORROW 9396; COURT ATTENDANT R DELGADO; APPEARANCES:; VICTORIA C KNOWLES FOR EDWARD DAVIS NOT PRESENT; OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART P.C. FOR THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; THERE BEING NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, THE COURT ORDERS THIS MATTER SET FOR:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : DISMISSAL/STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT SET FOR 03/25/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S22.; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/13/15 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF A HEARING FOR STATUS OF REMOVAL SENT.; Minutes; A HEARING FOR STATUS OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT HAS BEEN SET FOR 10-13-15 AT 8:30AM; IN DEPT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/07/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150707-1770 $435.00; 150707-1770-CK Reference Number #96477

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON THE DONNA KARAN COMPANY LLC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/08/15 WITH COSTS OF $105.25 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • UPDATE CASE NAME.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY EDWARD DAVIS FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150511-0734 $435.00; 150511-0734-CK Reference Number #94962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.