This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 15:23:17 (UTC).

DAVIS -V- ASICS AMERICA CORP.

Case Summary

On 06/09/2015 DAVIS filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against ASICS AMERICA CORP. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8080

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EDWARD DAVIS

Defendant

ASICS AMERICA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNOWLES, VICTORIA C

4100 Newport Place Dr Suite 800

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY EDWARD DAVIS.

NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY EDWARD DAVIS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ASICS AMERICA CORPORATION FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ASICS AMERICA CORPORATION FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ASICS AMERICA CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/15/15 WITH COSTS OF $105.25 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ASICS AMERICA CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/15/15 WITH COSTS OF $105.25 FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150609-0549 $435.00; 150609-0549-CK Reference Number 95824

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2016
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/04/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY EDWARD DAVIS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ASICS AMERICA CORPORATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 06/09/2015 OF EDWARD DAVIS AS TO ASICS AMERICA CORPORATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ASICS AMERICA CORPORATION; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/15/15 WITH COSTS OF $105.25 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 150611-2166 $4.50; 150611-2166-CK Reference Number 31272

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 150609-0549 $435.00; 150609-0549-CK Reference Number 95824

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.