This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 01:46:02 (UTC).

DAVIDSON-V-LOPEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/15/2016 DAVIDSON-V-LOPEZ was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5607

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PHIL C DAVISDON

ALINDA DAVIDSON

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC WORKS

BERNADETTE MARIE LOPEZ

TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY

MICHAEL A MADSEN

TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

MICHAEL A. MADSEN

TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY (INCLUDING DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CLAY R. SIDES

120 S. Main Street

Fallbrook, CA 92028

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DANIELS, FINE, ISREAL, SCHONBUCH & LOBOVITS

1801 Century Park East, Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

GROSSBERG & HOEHN

1026 W Foothill Boulevard

Upland, CA 91786

CIHIGOYENETCHE GROSSBERG & CLOUSE

8038 Haven Ave Suite E

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

 

Court Documents

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY.

MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY.

DECLARATION OF L PEARSON ISO MSJ FILED

DECLARATION OF L PEARSON ISO MSJ FILED

DISMISSAL AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION LOSS OF CONSORTIUM AS TO TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY FILED.

DISMISSAL AS TO CAUSE OF ACTION LOSS OF CONSORTIUM AS TO TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES FILED.; Minutes; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 03/01/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 03/05/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL RESPONSES SET FOR HEARING ON 02/01/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY (INCLUDINGDEPARTMENT (IMAGED)

MOTION RE: TO COMPEL RESPONSES SET FOR HEARING ON 02/01/17, FILED BY DEFENDANT TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY (INCLUDINGDEPARTMENT (IMAGED)

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT & TRIAL FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT & TRIAL FILED.; Minutes; LAW & MOTION RE: FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY SET FOR 02/20/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S24.; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 06/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/02/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2016 OF TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2016 OF TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENTOF PUBLIC, WITH PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENTOF PUBLIC, WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENTOF PUBLIC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENTOF PUBLIC.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL FILED.

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO MOTIONS TO COMPEL FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS ISO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2016 OF TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY NAMING ROES 1 TO BE MICHAEL A MADSEN FILED

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2016 OF TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY NAMING ROES 1 TO BE MICHAEL A MADSEN FILED

REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF BERNADETTE LOPEZ AND MICHAEL MADSEN TO MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18 FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENTOF PUBLIC. (IMAGED)

REPLY TO OPPOSITION OF BERNADETTE LOPEZ AND MICHAEL MADSEN TO MOTION RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 02/20/18 FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENTOF PUBLIC. (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

ANSWER FILED BY BERNADETTE MARIE LOPEZ, MICHAEL A MADSEN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DANIELS, FINE, ISREAL, SCHONBUCH & LOBOVITS.

ANSWER FILED BY BERNADETTE MARIE LOPEZ, MICHAEL A MADSEN; PARTY REPRESENTED BY DANIELS, FINE, ISREAL, SCHONBUCH & LOBOVITS.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 08/02/2016 OF BERNADETTE LOPEZ FILED BY BERNADETTE MARIE LOPEZ, MICHAEL A. MADSEN, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF BERNADETTE MARIE LOPEZ, MICHAEL A. MADSEN, ON 09/07/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2016 OF TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY, WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY, ON 09/07/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENTOF PUBLIC, WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PARTIAL, CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY TOWN OF APPLE VALLY, DEPARTMENTOF PUBLIC, TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS.; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • READINESS CALENDAR; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ON JOINT STIP TO CONTINUE TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATES FILED.; Minutes; SET ON TRIAL READINESS/ASSIGNMENT CALENDAR FOR 10/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S24; JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/22/18 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT S24 ESTIMATED DURATION OF 5 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
93 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2016
  • UPDATE COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 06/01/2016 OF TOWN OF APPLE VALLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • VOLUME # 1 BEGINS ON THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • NEW VOLUME MADE. VOLUME 1 INCLUDES DOCUMENTS FILED BETWEEN 04/15/16 AND 08/15/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY PHIL C DAVISDON, ALINDA DAVIDSON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FILING FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 160415-0216 $435.00; 160415-0216-CK Reference Number 2643

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S24

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.