Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/14/2018 at 14:03:08 (UTC).

DAVID VARGAS -N- DANIELLE MARIA MADRIGAL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2017 DAVID VARGAS -N- DANIELLE MARIA MADRIGAL was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5672

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Others

DAVID VARGAS

DANIELLE MARIA MADRIGAL

Respondent and Other

DANIELLE MARIA MADRIGAL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2017
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SET ASIDE DEFAULT/VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISS CASE FILED.; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT DANIELLE MARIA MADRIGAL.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO DANIELLE MARIA MADRIGAL; ON COURT MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: AT REQUEST OF BOTH PARTIES.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION - DISMISSAL AFTER HEARING (FL); DISPOSITION DISMISSAL AFTER HEARING (FL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY DAVID VARGAS FOR STIP/ORDER; Minutes; Receipt: 171107-0308 $20.00; 171107-0308-CK Reference Number 0998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0491 $27.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CHILD SUPPORT CASE REGISTRY FORM RECEIVED FROM DANIELLE MARIA MADRIGAL AND SENT TO THE DEPARTMENT OF SOCIAL SERVICES IN SACRAMENTO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 01/31/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 07/07/2017 OF DAVID VARGAS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT FILED ON DANIELLE MARIA MADRIGAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DAVID VARGAS FOR PRELIMINARY/FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF RETURNED DOCUMENTS SENT.; Minutes; JUDGMENT PACKET IS BEING RETURNED BY THE COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: MISSING FL-141 FOR; PRELIMINARY AND FINAL.; NOTICES PRINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2017
  • CII PROCESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • EX PARTE RE: TRO/DV FILED BY DAVID VARGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR ORDER ON DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FILED BY DAVID VARGAS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY DAVID VARGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF DAVID VARGAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170707-0278 $435.00; 170707-0278-CK Reference Number 3248

    Read MoreRead Less